Caldwell et al v. Redstone Federal Credit Union et al

Plaintiff: Demetrius D Caldwell and Sabrina B Caldwell
Defendant: Redstone Federal Credit Union and Law Office of C Howard Grisham
Case Number: 2:2015cv01923
Filed: October 29, 2015
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2018 101 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 76 79 MOTIONS to Dismiss to the extent that the claims of Plaintiffs Bart Reeves, Davis A. Mitchell, Jeremy D. Holland, Jessalyn Hooper, and Lorondo Brazelton are DISMISSED. The Motions are also GRANTED to the extent Plaintiff Jane B. Locklin's FDCPA claims based on Defendants' 2015 revival of the judgment against her are DISMISSED. The Motions are DENIED in all other respects. Defendants are DIRECTED to Answer the second Amended Complaint by August 3, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 7/20/2018. (JLC)
January 2, 2018 73 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 51 53 MOTIONS to Dismiss and GRANTING the alternative motions for a more definite statement. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file an Amended Complaint by January 16, 2018, which should include the factual basis for the New Plaintiffs' claims that Defendants wrongfully attempted to collect the debts they discharged in bankruptcy. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 1/2/2018. (JLC)
September 8, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Based on the foregoing, Defendants motions to dismiss, (docs. 7 & 10), are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Specifically, Counts III and IV are DISMISSED; Count V is DISMISSED, but only as a separate count and without any effect on the underlying claim for attorneys fees; and Counts I and II remain pending.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell et al v. Redstone Federal Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius D Caldwell
Represented By: Lange Clark
Represented By: Robert Clois Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina B Caldwell
Represented By: Lange Clark
Represented By: Robert Clois Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redstone Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Timothy P Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of C Howard Grisham
Represented By: Larry W Harper
Represented By: Christie J Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?