Shuler et al v. Garrison et al
Plaintiff: Shuler, Roger Shuler and Carol Shuler
Defendant: Garrison, Cliff Sims, Alabama Media Group, Stephens Millirons, Liz Welch, Jessica Medeiros Garrison, Nowlin & Associates, Justin Craft, John Williams, Leada Gore, Bill Baxley, Yellowhammer News, James J Odom, Jr, Luther Strange, Clayton Mobley, Joel Dillard, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Rob Riley, Lara G Williams, Robert Wermuth, Jag Investment Strategies, Marie Claire, Preston Crider, Charles Nowlin, Liberty Duke, AL.com, Spartan Value Investors, Lindsay Jackson, Angela Gulledge Crider, James F Williams, Christina Crow and Birmingham Water Works
Case Number: 2:2016cv00695
Filed: April 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Referring Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER denying #189 Motion for Relief from judgment. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 12/5/2018. (KWC) Modified text on 12/5/2018 (KWC) cm
December 4, 2018 Filing 189 MOTION for Relief from Judgment by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (KEK)
January 30, 2018 Filing 188 USCA JUDGMENT ISSUED AS MANDATE AFFIRMING the District Court's decision re #179 Notice of Appeal filed by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (Attachments: #1 Opinion)(JLC)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER of USCA GRANTING Appelle's Motion for extension of time re #179 Notice of Appeal filed by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (JLC)
June 26, 2017 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Northern District of Alabama certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #179 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 17-11287-FF. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (JLC)
June 23, 2017 Filing 186 Appeal Remark: An extension of time has been granted to and including July 7, 2017, for filing the appellee brief of Jag Investments, James F. Williams and Lara G. Williams (KAM)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER GRANTING #180 MOTION for Leave to Proceed On Appeal In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 3/31/2017. (JLC)
March 27, 2017 Filing 184 Mail Returned as Deceased. Mail sent to Roger Shuler re #169 Order. (JLC)
March 24, 2017 Filing 183 USCA Case Number 17-11287-F and Notification for #179 Notice of Appeal filed by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (JLC)
March 23, 2017 Filing 182 Transmission of #179 Notice of Appeal, #169 Memo Opinion and Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #179 Notice of Appeal. (JLC)
March 23, 2017 Filing 181 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL re #179 Notice of Appeal. (JLC)
March 23, 2017 Filing 180 MOTION for Leave to Proceed On Appeal In Forma Pauperis by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (JLC)
March 23, 2017 Filing 179 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #169 Memorandum Opinion And Order DENYING #155 MOTION to Amend/Correct, DENYING #156 MOTION to Alter Judgment by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (JLC)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER DENYING #177 MOTION to Vacate all of Judge Proctor's and Judge Hopkins' Orders on Plaintiffs' Rule 59 Motion, FINDING AS MOOT IN PART and DENYING IN PART #176 MOTION for Recusal. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 3/17/2017. (JLC)
March 13, 2017 Filing 177 MOTION to Vacate all of Judge Proctor's and Judge Hopkins' Orders on Plaintiffs' Rule 59 Motion by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (JLC)
March 13, 2017 Filing 176 MOTION for Recusal by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (JLC)
March 13, 2017 Filing 175 NOTICE of Change of Address by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (JLC)
March 10, 2017 Filing 174 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Roger and Carol Shuler re #166 #167 Orders. (JLC)
March 9, 2017 Filing 173 Mail Returned (doc 165) as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Carol Shuler (TLM, )
March 9, 2017 Filing 172 Mail Returned (doc 163)as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Carol Shuler (TLM, )
March 9, 2017 Filing 171 Mail Returned (doc 165) as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Roger Shuler (TLM, )
March 9, 2017 Filing 170 Mail Returned (doc 163)as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Roger Shuler (TLM, )
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #155 MOTION to Amend/Correct, DENYING #156 MOTION to Alter Judgment as set out herein. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 2/27/2017. (JLC)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 TEXT ORDER VACATING #166 Uniform Initial Order and #167 Order - entered in error. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 2/24/2017. (KWC)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER REGARDING RULE 7.1. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 05/11/2016. (KWC)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 2/23/2017. (KWC)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER -The Motion to Recuse #157 is DENIED. Nevertheless, for reasons wholly unrelated to the "arguments" made in the motion, the undersigned hereby RECUSES himself from further participation in this case. This case is reassigned to Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/23/2017. (AVC)
February 21, 2017 Filing 164 Opposition to #156 Plaintiffs' Post-Judgment Motion and #155 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Angela Gulledge Crider, Preston Crider. (Skinner, Thomas)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on the Motion to Withdraw filed by attorneys G. Courtney French, C. Paige Goldman and Samuel K. Ford. #161 The Motion #161 is GRANTED, The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate attorneys French, Goldman and Ford. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/21/2017. (AVC)
February 21, 2017 Filing 162 Opposition to #155 , #156 Plaintiffs' Post-Judgment Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Rob Riley. (Stott, Joseph)
February 21, 2017 Filing 161 MOTION to Withdraw as to G. Courtney French, C. Paige Goldman and Samuel K. Ford by Birmingham Water Works. (French, G)
February 21, 2017 Filing 160 RESPONSE in Opposition to #156 Plaintiffs' Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Under FRCP 59 and Request for Leave of Court to Amend Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank. (Davis, Richard)
February 21, 2017 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary H Thompson on behalf of Birmingham Water Works (Thompson, Mary)
February 20, 2017 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by K Mark Parnell on behalf of Birmingham Water Works (Parnell, K)
February 9, 2017 Filing 157 MOTION to Recuse by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (AVC)
February 9, 2017 Filing 156 MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment Under FRCP 59 by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (AVC)
February 9, 2017 Filing 155 REQUEST for Leave of Court to Amend Complaint, Per FRCP 15 by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(AVC)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER -In accordance with the Memorandum Opinion #153 , the court ORDERS that the Motions to Dismiss #11 , #18 , #19 , #21 , #22 , #27 , #28 , #29 , #30 , #38 , #39 , #41 , #54 , #75 , #77 , #78 , #79 , #80 , #84 , #88 , #132 , #141 , #146 are GRANTED. Because all claims against all Dfts are now dismissed, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The remaining Motions #116 , #118 are TERMINATED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/13/2017. (AVC)
January 13, 2017 Filing 153 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/13/2017. (AVC)
December 22, 2016 Filing 152 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Liberty Duke filed by Liberty Duke. (MRR, )
December 9, 2016 Filing 151 ADDENDUM No. 3 to Plaintiffs' Responses to Motions to Dismiss filed by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (AVC)
December 6, 2016 Filing 150 REPLY in Support of #132 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Marie Claire, Liz Welch. (Little, Jonathan)
December 6, 2016 Filing 149 REPLY in Support of #141 Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Cliff Sims, Yellowhammer News. (Little, Jonathan)
December 5, 2016 Filing 148 Addendum No. 2 to Plaintiffs' Responses to Motions to Dismiss filed by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (AVC)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER- re: Liberty Duke's Motion to Dismiss #146 . The parties are DIRECTED to brief Defendant's Motion in accordance with "Exhibit B" of the court's Initial Order #53 . Plaintiff SHALL file their response by 12/12/2016. Defendant SHALL file their reply brief by 12/19/2016. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/5/2016. (AVC)
December 1, 2016 Filing 146 MOTION to Dismiss by Liberty Duke. (AVC)
December 1, 2016 Filing 145 ADDENDUM No. 2 to Plaintiffs' Response to Motions to Dismiss by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (AVC)
November 22, 2016 Filing 144 REPLY in Support of #75 Motion to Dismiss filed by Birmingham Water Works. (Goldman, C)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER -The Motion for Leave to File Corrected Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss #140 is GRANTED. Dft is directed to file a copy of its corrected reply brief with the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/22/2016. (AVC)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER - re: Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #141 . Pltfs SHALL file their responsive brief to Dfts' Motion to Dismiss by 12/1/2016. Dfts' SHALL file their reply brief by 12/6/2016. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/22/2016. (AVC)
November 21, 2016 Filing 141 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Cliff Sims, Yellowhammer News. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Default Judgment Order, #2 Exhibit B Marie Claire Article, #3 Exhibit C Yellowhammer Article)(Little, Jonathan)
November 21, 2016 Filing 140 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Birmingham Water Works. (Goldman, C)
November 21, 2016 Filing 139 SUPPLEMENTAL Submission in Support of #130 , #131 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan Donnellan and Eva Saketkoo filed by Marie Claire, Liz Welch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Little, Jonathan)
November 18, 2016 Filing 138 REPLY in Support of #75 Motion to Dismiss filed by Birmingham Water Works. (Goldman, C)
November 16, 2016 Filing 137 SUMMONS Returned Executed Liberty Duke served on 11/7/2016, answer due 11/28/2016. (AVC)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER -The Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorneys Eva M. Saketkoo #130 and Jonathan R. Donnellan #131 are CONDITIONALLY GRANTED. By 11/21/2016 attorneys Saketkoo and Donnellan SHALL comply with this order as set out. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/15/2016. (AVC)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER- re: Motion to Dismiss #132 . Plaintiffs SHALL file their responsive brief to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by 12/1/2016. Defendants' SHALL file their reply brief by 12/6/2016. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/15/2016. (AVC)
November 14, 2016 Filing 134 ADDENDUM No. 2 to Plaintiffs' Response to Motions to Dismiss by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (AVC)
November 14, 2016 Filing 133 NOTICE of Address Change for Defendant Liberty Duke by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (AVC)
November 14, 2016 PHV Fee paid: $50, Receipt# 1126-2737189 (ALND# B4601075855). (Little, Jonathan) Modified on 11/14/2016 (AVC).
November 14, 2016 PHV Fee paid: $50, Receipt# 1126-2737194 (ALND# B4601075856). (Little, Jonathan) Modified on 11/14/2016 (AVC).
November 11, 2016 Filing 132 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Marie Claire, Liz Welch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Little, Jonathan)
November 11, 2016 Filing 131 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan R. Donnellan by Marie Claire, Liz Welch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Little, Jonathan)
November 11, 2016 Filing 130 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eva M. Saketkoo by Marie Claire, Liz Welch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Little, Jonathan)
November 11, 2016 Filing 129 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marie Claire. filed by Marie Claire (Little, Jonathan)
November 2, 2016 Filing 128 SUMMONS Returned Executed Cliff Sims served on 10/31/2016, answer due 11/21/2016; Yellowhammer News served on 10/31/2016, answer due 11/21/2016. (AVC)
October 31, 2016 Filing 127 Summons Issued as to Liberty Duke; delivered to U.S. Marshals for service. (AVC)
October 31, 2016 Filing 126 NOTICE of Address Change for Defendant Liberty Duke by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (AVC)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER -If Pltfs wish to proceed in this action against Dft Duke, Pltfs are DIRECTED to provide the Clerk with a proper address for Dft Duke so that the court may attempt to effect proper service on Dft Duke on their behalf. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/26/2016. (AVC)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER -re: Responses to Motions to Dismiss #96 . The Pltfs contend that, at the time of their responses, they had not been served with a Motion to Dismiss from Birmingham Water Works. The court GRANTS Pltfs additional time to respond to BWW's Motion. Further, Pltfs are notified that they may query this document and others in this case by registering for PACER online at the website http://www.pacer.gov. Pltfs MAY file a reponse to BWW's Motion to Dismiss by 11/14/2016. Dft Birmingham Water Works MAY file a reply by 11/18/2016. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/26/2016. (AVC)
October 26, 2016 Filing 123 Summons Issued as to Cliff Sims, Yellowhammer News; delivered to the U.S. Marshals for service. (AVC)
October 26, 2016 Filing 122 NOTICE-Letter to the Court that Christina Crow is not agent for service of defendant Liberty Duke by Christina Crow. [Deemed received on 9/6/2016]. (AVC)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER-The Request for Permission to Participate in Rule 26 Meeting Via Telephone Conference #117 is MOOT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/17/2016. (AVC)
October 13, 2016 Filing 120 RESPONSES to #77 Motions to Dismiss filed by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (AVC)
October 13, 2016 Filing 119 RESPONSE to #105 Reply Regarding Motion to Dismiss filed by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (AVC)
October 13, 2016 Filing 118 REQUEST for Leave to Respond to Defendant Rob Riley's Reply re: Motion to Dismiss by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (AVC)
October 13, 2016 Filing 117 REQUEST for Permission to Participate in Rule 26 Meeting via Telephone Conference by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (AVC)
October 13, 2016 Filing 116 Notice of Address Change for Defendants Yellowhammer New and Cliff Sims and Motion to have them Served by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (AVC)
October 13, 2016 Filing 115 REQUEST by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing by Roger Shuler. (AVC)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER -The Unopposed Motion of All Parties to Stay Rule 26 Obligations #113 is GRANTED. The court ORDERS a stay of the Parties' obligations under FRCP 26 until the court rules on the pending Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/7/2016. (AVC)
October 5, 2016 Filing 113 Unopposed MOTION of All Parties to Stay Rule 26 Obligations by Alabama Media Group, Leada Gore. (Little, Jonathan)
September 28, 2016 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Kenneth Ford on behalf of Birmingham Water Works (Ford, Samuel)
September 28, 2016 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by G Courtney French on behalf of Birmingham Water Works (French, G)
September 22, 2016 Filing 110 REPLY to #96 Response to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank. (Davis, Richard)
September 22, 2016 Filing 109 REPLY to #96 Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Spartan Value Investors. (Miner, Joseph)
September 22, 2016 Filing 108 REPLY to #96 Response to Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Amended Complaint filed by Stephens Millirons, James J Odom, Jr, Robert Wermuth. (White, Joshua)
September 22, 2016 Filing 107 REPLY Brief in Support of #27 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Leada Gore. (Little, Jonathan)
September 22, 2016 Filing 106 REPLY to #96 Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Jag Investment Strategies, James F Williams, Lara G Williams. (Davenport, Teresa)
September 22, 2016 Filing 105 REPLY Brief in Support of #21 Motion to Dismiss filed by Rob Riley. (Stott, Joseph)
September 21, 2016 Filing 104 REPLY to #96 Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Bill Baxley. (Baxley, William)
September 21, 2016 Filing 103 REPLY to #96 Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Joel Dillard. (Dillard, Joel)
September 21, 2016 Filing 102 REPLY to #96 Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Jessica Medeiros Garrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dillard, Joel)
September 21, 2016 Filing 101 REPLY to #96 Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Justin Craft, Charles Nowlin, Nowlin & Associates. (Springfield, Stephen)
September 21, 2016 Filing 100 RESPONSE to #96 Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Angela Gulledge Crider, Preston Crider. (Skinner, Thomas)
September 21, 2016 Filing 99 REPLY to #96 Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Christina Crow. (Pflaum, Keith)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER -re: Plaintiffs' Responses to Motions to Dismiss #96 . To the extent Pltfs' contentions in their Responses can be construed as a second request for recusal, that request is DENIED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/21/2016. (AVC)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER -The Motion to Recuse (doc# 11 in 2:16-cv-00501-RDP) is DENIED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/14/2016. (AVC)
September 14, 2016 Filing 96 RESPONSES to Motions to Dismiss filed by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (AVC)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 TEXT ORDER -This matter is before the court on an informal request for an extension of time for the parties to conduct their Rule 26(f) conference and file a joint report. This request is GRANTED. The parties SHALL confer with respect to their Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) obligations on or before October 24, 2016. The parties SHALL file a joint report of their planning meeting on or before November 7. 2016. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/12/2016. (AVC)
September 6, 2016 Filing 94 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Carol Shuler re: Order #62 . (AVC)
September 6, 2016 Filing 93 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Roger Shuler re: Order #62 (AVC)
September 6, 2016 Filing 92 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Carol Shuler re: Order #46 . (AVC)
September 6, 2016 Filing 91 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Roger Shuler re: Order #46 . (AVC)
September 6, 2016 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa D Davenport on behalf of Jag Investment Strategies, James F Williams, Lara G Williams (Davenport, Teresa)
September 1, 2016 Filing 89 NOTICE of Service of #88 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Lara G Williams. (McGarrah, Walter)
September 1, 2016 Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss by Lara G Williams. (McGarrah, Walter)
August 31, 2016 Filing 87 NOTICE of Service of Motion to Dismiss and Amended Motion to Dismiss by Stephens Millirons, James J Odom, Jr, Robert Wermuth. (White, Joshua)
August 31, 2016 Filing 86 NOTICE of Service of #29 Motion to Dismiss by Spartan Value Investors. (Miner, Joseph)
August 30, 2016 Filing 85 NOTICE of Re-Service of #84 Motion to Dismiss by Jag Investment Strategies, James F Williams. (McGarrah, Walter)
August 30, 2016 Filing 84 MOTION to Dismiss by Jag Investment Strategies, James F Williams. (McGarrah, Walter)
August 29, 2016 Filing 83 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alabama Media Group. (Little, Jonathan)
August 25, 2016 Filing 82 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Carol Shuler re: (doc# 47). (AVC)
August 25, 2016 Filing 81 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Carol Shuler re: Order #46 . (AVC)
August 25, 2016 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Justin Craft, Charles Nowlin, Nowlin & Associates. (Springfield, Stephen)
August 24, 2016 Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss by Luther Strange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defense Exhibit 1)(Wallace, Jack)
August 24, 2016 Filing 78 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Leada Gore. (Little, Jonathan)
August 24, 2016 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by AL.com, Alabama Media Group. (Little, Jonathan)
August 24, 2016 Filing 76 SUMMONS Returned Executed Marie Claire; Liz Welch served. (AVC)
August 22, 2016 Filing 75 MOTION to Dismiss by Birmingham Water Works. (Goldman, C)
August 17, 2016 Filing 74 NOTICE by Rob Riley re #21 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief Notice of Service (Stott, Joseph)
August 17, 2016 Filing 73 NOTICE by Bill Baxley re #39 MOTION to Dismiss (Dillard, Joel)
August 17, 2016 Filing 72 NOTICE by Joel Dillard re #38 MOTION to Dismiss (Dillard, Joel)
August 17, 2016 Filing 71 NOTICE by Jessica Medeiros Garrison re #22 MOTION to Dismiss (Dillard, Joel)
August 17, 2016 Filing 70 NOTICE by Leada Gore re #27 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Notice of Re-Service of Defendant Leada Gore's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (Little, Jonathan)
August 17, 2016 Filing 69 NOTICE by Christina Crow (Pflaum, Keith)
August 16, 2016 Filing 68 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank (Davis, Richard)
August 16, 2016 Filing 67 NOTICE by Angela Gulledge Crider, Preston Crider Notice of Service of Angela Gulledge Crider and Preston Crider (Skinner, Thomas)
August 16, 2016 Filing 66 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jag Investment Strategies; James F Williams; Lara G Williams served on 8/12/2016, answer due 9/2/2016. (AVC)
August 16, 2016 Filing 65 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to James F Williams, Lara G Williams. (AVC)
August 16, 2016 Filing 64 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Liz Welch. (AVC)
August 16, 2016 Filing 63 NOTICE by Justin Craft, Charles Nowlin, Nowlin & Associates Notice of Service of Doc. 11 and Doc. 59 (Springfield, Stephen)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER-The Motion for Extension of Time #56 is GRANTED. By 8/31/2016, Dfts who have appeared in this case and filed motions to Dismiss SHALL again serve those dismissal motions #11 , #18 , #19 , #21 , #22 , #27 , #28 , #29 , #30 , #38 , #39 , #41 , #54 on Pltfs at their current address of record. Pltfs SHALL file a response brief to Dfts' dismissal motions by 9/15/2016. Dfts SHALL fiel reply briefs by 9/22/2016. Pltfs are REMINDED that they SHALL properly file notice of any future changes of address that may occur during the life of this case so that the court and all parties are given adequate notice thereof. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/16/2016. (AVC)
August 15, 2016 Filing 61 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Nowlin & Associates (Springfield, Stephen)
August 15, 2016 Filing 60 REPLY to Plaintiff's Failure to Respond to Motion to Dismiss filed by Angela Gulledge Crider, Preston Crider. (Skinner, Thomas)
August 15, 2016 Filing 59 REPLY Brief filed by Defendants Justin Craft, Charles Nowlin, Nowlin & Associates re: #23 Order, #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Justin Craft, Charles Nowlin, Nowlin & Associates. (Springfield, Stephen)
August 15, 2016 Filing 58 REPLY to #23 , #19 Failure to Comply with This Court's Order filed by Christina Crow. (Pflaum, Keith)
August 15, 2016 Filing 57 REPLY Brief Addressing Plaintiffs' Failure to Comply with Order to Respond to her Motion to Dismiss #22 filed by Jessica Medeiros Garrison. (James, Donald)
August 15, 2016 Filing 56 MOTION for Extension of Time by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (MRR, )
August 12, 2016 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stephens Millirons, James J Odom, Jr, Robert Wermuth. (White, Joshua)
August 12, 2016 Filing 54 SUPPLEMENT to #28 Motion to Dismiss by Stephens Millirons, James J Odom, Jr, Robert Wermuth. (White, Joshua)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/11/2016. (AVC)
August 10, 2016 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by J Banks Sewell, III on behalf of Alabama Media Group (Sewell, J)
August 10, 2016 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R Little on behalf of Alabama Media Group (Little, Jonathan)
August 10, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by John G Thompson, Jr on behalf of Alabama Media Group (Thompson, John)
August 10, 2016 Filing 49 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 4:16-cv-695-RDP on all subsequent pleadings. The status conference set for August 11, 2016 is CANCELLED. (MRR, )
August 10, 2016 Filing 48 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Cliff Sims. -Deemed filed 8/9/16(MRR, )
August 10, 2016 Filing 47 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Yellowhammer News.-Deemed filed 8/9/16 (MRR, )
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER - re: #27 , #28 , #29 , #30 , #38 , #39 & #41 Motions to Dismiss. Any response by the plaintiffs to the motions is due by 8/24/2016. Reply briefs, if any, must be filed by 8/31/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/10/2016. (AVC)
August 8, 2016 Filing 45 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Jag Investment Strategies, James F Williams, Lara G Williams, sent to US Marshals for service (MRR, )
August 8, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE to Correct Addresses for Service on Three Defendants by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler (MRR, )
August 5, 2016 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed Alabama Media Group served on 8/3/2016, answer due 8/24/2016. (MRR, )
August 5, 2016 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank. filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank (Davis, Richard)
August 5, 2016 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank. (Davis, Richard)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER reminding parties Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than August 27, 2016. Pursuant to order entered on July 18, 2016, (doc #12 ) a telephone status conference is scheduled for 10:15 a.m. on August 11, 2016. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/4/16. (ASL)
August 3, 2016 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss by Bill Baxley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxley, William)
August 3, 2016 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss by Joel Dillard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dillard, Joel)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER- The deft Alabama Attorney General Luther Strange's Motion for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (Doc #31 ) is GRANTED IN PART; Deft shall have until August 24, 2016 to answer or respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 7/28/16. (MRR, )
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER- Pltf's Amended Motion for Court to Execute Service for pltfs proceeding In Forma Pauperis and Notice of Defts' Addresses Attached(Doc #9 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 7/28/16. (MRR, )
July 28, 2016 Filing 35 Summons Issued as to Alabama Media Group, James F Williams, Lara G Williams, sent to US Marshals for service (MRR, )
July 27, 2016 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed JPMorgan Chase Bank served on 7/15/2016, answer due 8/5/2016. (MRR, )
July 27, 2016 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed Marie Claire served (no date entered on green card) (MRR, )
July 27, 2016 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jessica Medeiros Garrison served on 7/2/2016, answer due 7/25/2016. (MRR, )
July 27, 2016 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time by Luther Strange. (Wallace, Jack)
July 27, 2016 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in Argument of Motion to Dismiss of Co-Defendants Nowlin & Associates, Charles Nowlin and Justin Craft by Angela Gulledge Crider. (Skinner, Thomas)
July 26, 2016 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss by Spartan Value Investors, Lindsay Jackson, Clayton Mobley. (Miner, Joseph) Modified on 7/27/2016 (ASL).
July 26, 2016 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #1 and Amended Complaint #10 by Stephens Millirons, James J Odom, Jr, Robert Wermuth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Joshua)
July 26, 2016 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint #1 by Leada Gore. (Little, Jonathan)
July 25, 2016 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed Preston Crider served on 7/20/2016, answer due 8/10/2016.-Deemed filed 7/22/16 (MRR, )
July 25, 2016 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed Angela Gulledge Crider served on 7/20/2016, answer due 8/10/2016. (MRR, ) -Deemed filed 7/22/16 Modified on 7/25/2016 (MRR, ).
July 25, 2016 Filing 24 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Jag Investment Strategies. (MRR, )-Deemed filed 7/22/16 Modified on 7/25/2016 (MRR, ).
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER- re the pending Motions to Dismiss (Docs #11 , #18 , #19 , #21 , #22 ); Any response by the plts is due no later than August 8, 2016; Reply briefs, if any, must be filed no later than August 15, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 7/25/16. (MRR, )
July 22, 2016 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Jessica Medeiros Garrison. (Dillard, Joel)
July 22, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief by Rob Riley. (Stott, Joseph)
July 20, 2016 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed Joel Dillard served on 7/13/2016, answer due 8/3/2016. (MRR, )
July 20, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Christina Crow. (Pflaum, Keith)
July 20, 2016 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Angela Gulledge Crider, Preston Crider. (Skinner, Thomas)
July 19, 2016 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed Bill Baxley served on 7/13/2016, answer due 8/3/2016.-Deemed filed 7/15/16 (MRR, )
July 19, 2016 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed Liberty Duke served on 7/11/2016 (no date entered on green card, court's file date used), answer due 8/1/2016. (MRR, )-Deemed filed 7/11/16 Modified on 7/19/2016 (MRR, ).
July 19, 2016 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed James J Odom, Jr served on 7/7/2016, answer due 7/28/2016.-Deemed filed 7/14/16 (MRR, )
July 19, 2016 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Nowlin & Associates served on 7/6/2016, answer due 7/27/2016; Luther Strange served on 7/6/2016, answer due 7/27/2016.-Deemed filed 7/11/16 (MRR, )
July 19, 2016 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Birmingham Water Works served on 7/5/2016, answer due 7/26/2016; Justin Craft served on 7/5/2016, answer due 7/26/2016; Leada Gore served on 7/5/2016, answer due 7/26/2016; Lindsay Jackson served on 7/5/2016, answer due 7/26/2016; Stephens Millirons served on 7/5/2016, answer due 7/26/2016; Clayton Mobley served on 7/5/2016, answer due 7/26/2016; Charles Nowlin served on 7/5/2016, answer due 7/26/2016; Rob Riley served on 7/5/2016, answer due 7/26/2016; Spartan Value Investors served on 7/5/2016, answer due 7/26/2016; Robert Wermuth served on 7/5/2016, answer due 7/26/2016. (MRR, )*Deemed filed 7/11/16 Modified on 7/19/2016 (MRR, ).
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than August 27, 2016. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after August 27, 2016. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:15 a.m. on August 11, 2016. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 7/18/16. (MRR, )
July 13, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Justin Craft, Charles Nowlin, Nowlin & Associates. (Springfield, Stephen)
July 8, 2016 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT, Correcting or Adding Highlighted Defendants, filed by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler.(MRR, )
July 8, 2016 Filing 9 AMENDED MOTION for Court to Execute Service and Notice of Defendants Addresses by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (MRR, )
June 23, 2016 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to James J Odom, Jr, Rob Riley, Cliff Sims, Spartan Value Investors, Luther Strange, Liz Welch, Robert Wermuth, Yellowhammer News, sent to US Marshals for service (MRR, )
June 22, 2016 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bill Baxley, Birmingham Water Works, Marie Claire, Justin Craft, Angela Gulledge Crider, Preston Crider, Christina Crow, Joel Dillard, Liberty Duke, Jessica Medeiros Garrison, Leada Gore, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Lindsay Jackson, Jag Investment Strategies, Stephens Millirons, Clayton Mobley, Charles Nowlin, Nowlin & Associates, sent to US Marshals for service (MRR, )
June 20, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE (Motion for Court to Execute Service for Plaintiffs Proceeding In Forma Pauperis and Notice of Defendants' Addresses Attached) by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler (MRR, )
May 18, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua B White on behalf of Stephens Millirons, James J Odom, Jr, Robert Wermuth (White, Joshua)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on May 2, 2016. (AMP)
April 29, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT (MRR, )
April 29, 2016 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler. (MRR, )
April 29, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carol Shuler, Roger Shuler.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shuler et al v. Garrison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Shuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Shuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliff Sims
Represented By: Jonathan R Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Media Group
Represented By: Jonathan R Little
Represented By: John G Thompson, Jr
Represented By: J Banks Sewell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephens Millirons
Represented By: Joshua B White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz Welch
Represented By: Jonathan R Little
Represented By: Eva M Saketkoo
Represented By: Jonathan R Donnellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Medeiros Garrison
Represented By: Joel E Dillard
Represented By: William J Baxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nowlin & Associates
Represented By: Stephen F Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Craft
Represented By: Stephen F Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leada Gore
Represented By: Jonathan R Little
Represented By: J Banks Sewell, III
Represented By: John G Thompson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Baxley
Represented By: Joel E Dillard
Represented By: William J Baxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellowhammer News
Represented By: Jonathan R Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J Odom, Jr
Represented By: Joshua B White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Strange
Represented By: Jack W Wallace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Mobley
Represented By: Joseph Todd Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Dillard
Represented By: Joel E Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Joshua R Hess
Represented By: Richard Jon Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Riley
Represented By: Joseph E Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lara G Williams
Represented By: Teresa D Davenport
Represented By: Walter Scott McGarrah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wermuth
Represented By: Joshua B White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jag Investment Strategies
Represented By: Teresa D Davenport
Represented By: Walter Scott McGarrah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Claire
Represented By: Jonathan R Little
Represented By: Eva M Saketkoo
Represented By: Jonathan R Donnellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Crider
Represented By: Thomas J Skinner, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Nowlin
Represented By: Stephen F Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AL.com
Represented By: Jonathan R Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartan Value Investors
Represented By: Joseph Todd Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay Jackson
Represented By: Joseph Todd Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Gulledge Crider
Represented By: Thomas J Skinner, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F Williams
Represented By: Teresa D Davenport
Represented By: Walter Scott McGarrah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Crow
Represented By: Larry W Harper
Represented By: Keith J Pflaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birmingham Water Works
Represented By: K Mark Parnell
Represented By: G Courtney French
Represented By: C Paige Goldman
Represented By: Samuel Kenneth Ford
Represented By: Mary H Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?