Cain v. Consumers Solutions Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Adrian Cain
Defendant: Consumers Solutions Group, LLC and Jonathan C. Frank & Associates, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02031
Filed: December 19, 2016
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 28 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Consumer Solutions Group, LLC and Jonathan C. Frank & Associates, PLLC. Plaintiff Adrian Cain is entitled to a default jud gment on Count I against both Defendants on the issue of liability. The issue liability as to Counts II and III, and the issue of damages will go to trial. The Court will enter a separate order setting this case for a pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 5/21/2018. (JLC)
May 8, 2018 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 28 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Consumer Solutions Group, LLC and Jonathan C. Frank & Associates, PLLC. The Defendants' 36 Opposition fails to persuade the Court to deny the motion f or default judgment. However, out of an abundance of caution, and recognizing the preference for deciding a case on the merits, the Court ORDERS Defendants' Opposition to the Motion is STRICKEN as untimely. Defendants are given seven days to enter the appearance of an attorney admitted to practice in the Northern District of Alabama and to move the Court to set aside the Clerk's Entries of Default, if they so choose. Plaintiff Adrian Cain is given seven days after the Defendants' time to file has expired to respond. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 5/8/2018. (JLC)
July 24, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 11 & 21 MOTIONS for Default Judgment as to Consumer Solutions Group, LLC and Jonathan C. Frank & Associates, PLLC. Furthermore, Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, whether he still intends to pursue the class action allegations in the Amended Complaint against Defendant CSG. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 7/24/2017. (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cain v. Consumers Solutions Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Cain
Represented By: Wesley L Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumers Solutions Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan C. Frank & Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?