Bowman v. Martin, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carrie Bowman
Defendant: Martin, Inc. and MSCO, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01112
Filed: June 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2017 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Western; Case Number 1:17-cv-01086. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #11 MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/30/17. (Anderson, S. Thomas) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
June 21, 2017 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 Response in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Martin, Inc.. (Price, Stephen) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #21 MOTION TO FILE A REPLY. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/21/17. (Anderson, S. Thomas) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
June 21, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of its Motion to Transfer Venue (Unopposed) (proposed order submitted) by Martin, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant Martin, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Transfer Venue)(Price, Stephen) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #16 MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Michael L. Lucas. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/15/17. (Anderson, S. Thomas) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
June 15, 2017 Filing 19 Notice of Correction to #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael L. Lucas (Proposed Order Submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0651-2565478) . (Lucas, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Change Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (proposed order submitted) filed by Carrie Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Carrie Bowman)(Sessions, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 17 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael L. Lucas (Proposed Order Submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0651-2565478) filed by Martin, Inc. has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: 1) Motions for Pro Hac Vice should be filed by the attorney seeking to be admitted Pro Hac Vice. The attorney seeking PHV admission should complete a Notice of Intent Form to receive a CM-ECF login and password. (The Notice of Intent form is available on the Courts website at www.tnwd.uscourts.gov and located under the Forms and Applications tab.) Once the login and password has been received, the attorney seeking PHV admission should file the Motion for Pro Hac Vice in the specific case using the event Notice of Correction and link back to the incorrectly filed Motion for Pro Hac Vice in order to correct this deficiency. Using the event Notice of Correction will also avoid payment screen for the Pro Hac Vice fee as the fee was previously paid when the motion was filed. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael L. Lucas (Proposed Order Submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0651-2565478) by Martin, Inc.. (Price, Stephen) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS #14 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/7/17. (Anderson, S.) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Change Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (proposed order submitted) (proposed order submitted) by Carrie Bowman. (Sessions, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 5/30/17. (Anderson, S.) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
May 26, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (proposed order submitted) by Martin, Inc.. (Price, Stephen) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
May 26, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION to Change Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (proposed order submitted) by Martin, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Ann Richey)(Price, Stephen) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
May 26, 2017 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Martin, Inc.. (Price, Stephen) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
May 12, 2017 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carrie Bowman as to Martin, Inc.. (Sessions, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Martin, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 4 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE by Carrie Bowman Civil Cover Sheet (Sessions, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Summons by William C. Sessions, III on behalf of Carrie Bowman. (Sessions, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]
May 3, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martin, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0651-2542101), filed by Carrie Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sessions, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2017.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman v. Martin, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Bowman
Represented By: William C. Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lee Lucas
Represented By: Stephen H Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSCO, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lee Lucas
Represented By: Stephen H Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?