Chicoine et al v. Wellmark, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bradley A. Chicoine, D.C., P.C., Rod R. Rebarcak, Ben Winecoff, Larry E. Phipps, Bradley A. Chicoine, Brown Chiropractic, P.C., Bradley J. Brown, Mark A. Niles, Mark A. Kruse, Dr. Mark A. Kruse, D.C., P.C., Niles Chiropractic, Inc., Steven A. Mueller and Kevin D. Miller
Defendant: Wellmark Health Plan of Iowa, Inc., Wellmark Inc and Wellmark Inc doing business as Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Iowa
Intervenor Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv01707
Filed: October 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2017 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:17-cv-00210. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 5, 2017 Filing 16 Certified Conditional Transfer Order MDL No. 2406 by clerk's office, District of Northern Alabama, ALND 2:17-cv-1707-RDP. (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/5/2017.]
October 5, 2017 ***Civil Case Terminated. Case electronically transferred to Alabama Northern. (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/5/2017.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 15 Certified Conditional Transfer Order MDL No. 2406 by Northern District of Alabama. (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/5/2017.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 14 TEXT MINUTE ORDER -- TO THE TRANSFEROR JUDGES/CLERKS OF THE ASSOCIATED CASES: This transmittal is for informational purposes only. No action is required at this time.A transfer order has been filed today in this litigation. Rule 2.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, states...An order to transfer or remand pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 shall be effective only upon its filing with the clerk of the transferee district court.You will receive a certified copy of this order from the transferee court along with notification of the newly assigned case number(s) in that district. With the advent of electronic filing, Rule 9.1 of the Panel Rules shall be satisfied upon transmittal of the portion of the file deemed necessary and requested by the transferee court.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 10/4/2017.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2406, IAS/4:17-cv-00210, LAW/6:17-cv-00818 (SM) (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/5/2017.]
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay. Wellmark shall immediately inform the court upon any action from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation concerning this case. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 7/19/2017. (mem) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/5/2017.]
July 7, 2017 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Wellmark Health Plan of Iowa, Inc., Wellmark, Inc.. (Roach, Benjamin) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 28, 2017 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Intervene by BCBSA filed by Bradley A. Chicoine, D.C., P.C., Bradley J. Brown, Brown Chiropractic, P.C., Bradley A. Chicoine, Dr. Mark A. Kruse, D.C., P.C., Mark A. Kruse, Kevin D. Miller, Steven A. Mueller, Mark A. Niles, Niles Chiropractic, Inc., Larry E. Phipps, Rod R. Rebarcak. Replies due by 7/5/2017. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Resistance to BCBSA's Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' Resistance to BCBSA's Motion to Intervene)(Simons, Kara) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 28, 2017 Filing 10 BRIEF Plaintiffs' Agreement to Stay in this Court While Issue of Removal to MDL No. 2406 Is Before the JPML by Bradley A. Chicoine, D.C., P.C., Bradley J. Brown, Brown Chiropractic, P.C., Bradley A. Chicoine, Dr. Mark A. Kruse, D.C., P.C., Mark A. Kruse, Kevin D. Miller, Steven A. Mueller, Mark A. Niles, Niles Chiropractic, Inc., Larry E. Phipps, Rod R. Rebarcak, Ben Winecoff . (Simons, Kara) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 28, 2017 Filing 9 Letter to MDL Panel Potential Tag-Along Action. Letter and Removal paperwork emailed to MDL. (don, ) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 23, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay by Wellmark Health Plan of Iowa, Inc., Wellmark, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 7/7/2017. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Draper, Hayward) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 20, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Bradley A. Chicoine, D.C., P.C., Brown Chiropractic, P.C., Bradley J. Brown, D.C., Bradley A. Chicoine, D.C., Mark A. Kruse, D.C., Mark A. Kruse, D.C., P.C., Kevin D. Mueller, D.C., Steven A. Mueller, D.C., Niles Chiropractic, Inc., Mark A. Niles, D.C., Larry E Phipps, Rod R. Rebarcak, D.C., Ben Winecoff, D.C.. Responses due by 7/5/2017. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Simons, Kara) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 16, 2017 Set Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for applicable plaintiffs 7/7/2017. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendants 7/7/2017. (rmj) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 16, 2017 Filing 6 PUBLIC DOCKET ANNOTATION: It appears Local Rule 7.1 applies in this case. Attached is this Court's Local Rule 7.1 packet. Deadlines are set accordingly by the Clerk's office. (rmj) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 15, 2017 Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr added. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams no longer assigned to case. (ml) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. Motion referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 6/28/2017. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (dmh) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting #3 defendants' motion for extension of time to move or plead (unopposed). Defendants shall have to and including 7/21/2017 to move or plead in response to the removed Petition. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/14/2017. (kln) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 3 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wellmark Health Plan of Iowa, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. d/b/a Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Iowa.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (Roach, Benjamin) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE by Wellmark Health Plan of Iowa, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. d/b/a Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Iowa re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, Supplemental Local Rule 81.a Statement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LL)(Roach, Benjamin) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wellmark, Inc. d/b/a Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Iowa, Wellmark Health Plan of Iowa, Inc. from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number CVCV050638. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3228051., filed by Wellmark, Inc. d/b/a Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Iowa, Wellmark Health Plan of Iowa, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 81.a Statement, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ, #38 Exhibit KK)(Roach, Benjamin) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/5/2017.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chicoine et al v. Wellmark, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmark Health Plan of Iowa, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Roach
Represented By: Hayward L Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmark Inc
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Roach
Represented By: Hayward L Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmark Inc doing business as Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Iowa
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Roach
Represented By: Hayward L Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley A. Chicoine, D.C., P.C.
Represented By: Steven P Wandro
Represented By: Glenn L Norris
Represented By: Kara Marie Simons
Represented By: Harley C Erbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rod R. Rebarcak
Represented By: Steven P Wandro
Represented By: Glenn L Norris
Represented By: Kara Marie Simons
Represented By: Harley C Erbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Winecoff
Represented By: Steven P Wandro
Represented By: Glenn L Norris
Represented By: Kara Marie Simons
Represented By: Harley C Erbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry E. Phipps
Represented By: Steven P Wandro
Represented By: Glenn L Norris
Represented By: Kara Marie Simons
Represented By: Harley C Erbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley A. Chicoine
Represented By: Steven P Wandro
Represented By: Glenn L Norris
Represented By: Kara Marie Simons
Represented By: Harley C Erbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brown Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: Steven P Wandro
Represented By: Glenn L Norris
Represented By: Kara Marie Simons
Represented By: Harley C Erbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley J. Brown
Represented By: Steven P Wandro
Represented By: Glenn L Norris
Represented By: Kara Marie Simons
Represented By: Harley C Erbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Niles
Represented By: Steven P Wandro
Represented By: Glenn L Norris
Represented By: Kara Marie Simons
Represented By: Harley C Erbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Kruse
Represented By: Steven P Wandro
Represented By: Glenn L Norris
Represented By: Kara Marie Simons
Represented By: Harley C Erbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Mark A. Kruse, D.C., P.C.
Represented By: Steven P Wandro
Represented By: Glenn L Norris
Represented By: Kara Marie Simons
Represented By: Harley C Erbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niles Chiropractic, Inc.
Represented By: Steven P Wandro
Represented By: Glenn L Norris
Represented By: Kara Marie Simons
Represented By: Harley C Erbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven A. Mueller
Represented By: Steven P Wandro
Represented By: Glenn L Norris
Represented By: Kara Marie Simons
Represented By: Harley C Erbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Miller
Represented By: Steven P Wandro
Represented By: Glenn L Norris
Represented By: Kara Marie Simons
Represented By: Harley C Erbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association
Represented By: Joan M Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?