Reynolds v. Behrman Capital IV L.P., et al
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Reynolds
Defendant: Behrman Capital IV L.P., AXA Primary Fund America IV LP, AXA Private Capital I, LP, Core Americas/Global Holdings, LP, Global Fund Partners II, LP, Metlife Insurance Company of Connecticut, Partners Group Direct Investments 2006, LP, Partners Group Global Opportunities Subholding Limited, PE Holding USD GMBH, Portfolio Advisors Secondary Fund, LP, Stepstone Private Equity Partners III Cayman Holdings, LP, Stepstone Private Equity Partners III, LP, The Governor and Company of the Bank of Iceland, Varma Mutual Pension Insurance Company, ASF III Blue Note Limited, Behrman Brothers IV L.L.C., Amanda Zeitlin, Greg M. Behrman, Gregory J. Chiate, Gary Dieber, Douglas E. Behrman Trust, Mark V. Grimes, Kimberly B. Behrman Trust, Simon Lonergan, William M. Matthes, Michael Rappaport, Pradyut Shah, Jeffrey S. Wu, Midcap Financial SBIC, LP, Behrman Brothers Management Corporation and Mintz ,Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00514
Filed: March 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM OPINION - The court WILL GRANT the motion to dismiss the amended complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction, and WILL DISMISS the amended complaint WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The court WILL DENY Mr. Reynolds' motion to transfer venue. The court will enter a separate order consistent with this opinion. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/3/2019. (KEK)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 2/11/2019. (TLM, )
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER The court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Mr. Reynolds' motion to remand or abstain, or in the alternative, to refer to the bankruptcy court 26 . The court SEVERS this case into three cases: (1) Counts One through Seven; (2) Counts Eight through Ten; and (3) Counts Eleven through Thirteen. The court GRANTS the motion to remand Counts Eight through Ten and REMANDS those counts to the Jefferson County Circuit Court. The court DENIES the motion to remand Counts One through Seven and Eleven through Thirteen, DENIES the motion to abstain from considering Counts One through Seven and Eleven through Thirteen, and DENIES the motion to refer Counts One through Seven and Eleven through Thirteen to the ba nkruptcy court. The court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to keep Counts One through Seven under this civil action number and to create a new civil action number for Counts Eleven through Thirteen, with the new action assigned directly to the undersigned. The court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to file Mintz Levin's motion to dismiss 30 in the newly created civil action number, and to term the same on this case's docket. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/6/18. (SAC )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Behrman Capital IV L.P., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Reynolds
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Bill D Bensinger
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Jonathan W Macklem
Represented By: Richard E Smith
Represented By: Daniel D Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Behrman Capital IV L.P.
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXA Primary Fund America IV LP
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXA Private Capital I, LP
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Americas/Global Holdings, LP
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Fund Partners II, LP
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metlife Insurance Company of Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partners Group Direct Investments 2006, LP
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partners Group Global Opportunities Subholding Limited
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PE Holding USD GMBH
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Advisors Secondary Fund, LP
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stepstone Private Equity Partners III Cayman Holdings, LP
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stepstone Private Equity Partners III, LP
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Governor and Company of the Bank of Iceland
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varma Mutual Pension Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASF III Blue Note Limited
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Behrman Brothers IV L.L.C.
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Zeitlin
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg M. Behrman
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Chiate
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Dieber
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas E. Behrman Trust
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark V. Grimes
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly B. Behrman Trust
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Lonergan
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Matthes
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rappaport
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pradyut Shah
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S. Wu
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midcap Financial SBIC, LP
Represented By: Larry B Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Behrman Brothers Management Corporation
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mintz ,Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C.
Represented By: Brian Dunphy
Represented By: Samuel H Franklin
Represented By: Michael S Gardener
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Amie Adelia Vague
Represented By: Adrienne K Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?