Brooks v. South Side Rent Office
Plaintiff: Linda Brooks
Defendant: South Side Rent Office
Case Number: 2:2018cv01202
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/3/2018. (AFS)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Reassignment- The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 2:18-cv-1202-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. (MRR, )
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT- A fair reading of the pltf's complaint, to which is attached a "Lease Termination Notice and Demand for Possession" indicates that the pltf is seeking emergency relief in the form of a temporary restraining order that would prevent the Housing Authority of the Birmingham District from evicting her from her apartment no August 10, 2018; The sworn complaint is thus construed as a verified petition seeking emergency relief pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65; The case is due to be assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings; Consequently, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign this case to a district judge randomly drawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/1/18. (MRR, )
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and MOTION to appoint Counsel Motion is RIPE 7/31/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Linda Brooks. (MRR, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against South Side Rent Office, filed by Linda Brooks.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. South Side Rent Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Side Rent Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?