Hall v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc
Plaintiff: Kevin Hall
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01269
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER. Certain deadlines and time limits apply, as set out herein. Discovery due by 5/31/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 6/21/2019; Joint Status Report due by 5/29/2019; Status Conference set for 6/5/2019 at 10:30 AM, eighth floor chambers, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. This case should be ready for trial by December, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/3/2018. (FNC)
October 2, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre: Scheduling Conference held on 10/2/2018. Written order to follow. (FNC)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #22 MOTION for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/1/2018. (JLC)
September 25, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Reconsideration re #21 Order by Kevin Hall. (Rutledge, W) Modified on 9/25/2018 (JLC).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING #10 MOTION to Change Venue to Middle District of Alabama. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/24/2018. (JLC)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for Tuesday, October 2, 2018 at 01:30 PM, eighth floor chambers, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/21/2018. (FNC)
September 19, 2018 Filing 19 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Baggett, Evan)
September 19, 2018 Filing 18 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Baggett, Evan)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: The court finds Plaintiff's "Motion to Continue Telephone Conference Scheduled for September 21, 2018" (doc. 16) as MOOT. The telephone conference scheduled for September 21, 2018 was previously canceled on September 10, 2018. (Doc. 13). Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 09/18/2018. (LMG)
September 17, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Continue TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 21, 2018 by Kevin Hall. (Rutledge, W)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. **The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/12/2018. (FNC)
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Baggett, Evan)
September 10, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE the status conference scheduled for 9/21/2018 is canceled. (AFS)
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:18-cv-01269-KOB on all future pleadings. (AFS)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline re #10 MOTION to Change Venue to Middle District of Alabama filed by Kevin Hall. Any opposition is due by September 19, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 9/6/2018. (CDG)
September 5, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Change Venue to Middle District of Alabama by Kevin Hall. (Rutledge, W)
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.(Baggett, Evan)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Dollar Tree Stores, Inc served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (AFS)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/23/2018. (AFS)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than October 6, 2018. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after October 6, 2018. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on September 21, 2018. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/23/2018. (AFS)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.(Ireland, Glenn)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. mailed certified mail. (AFS)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Kevin Hall. (AFS)
August 10, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400.00, (ALND B4601091226) receipt_number 1126-3149884. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Dollar Tree Stores, Inc, filed by Kevin Hall.(AFS). (Rutledge, W) Modified on 8/13/2018 (AFS).
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction. (AFS)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dollar Tree Stores, Inc, filed by Kevin Hall.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Hall
Represented By: W Eugene Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc
Represented By: Evan P Baggett
Represented By: Glenn E Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?