United States of America v. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Currency
Claimant: Henry Long Nguyen
Case Number: 2:2018cv01297
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the parties are required to enter an election regarding exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by 10/31/18; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 10/10/2018. (BST, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 VERIFIED ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Currency($17,400 in United States Currency), Currency(6.19 Bitcoins), Currency(6.23 Bitcoin Cash).(Hanle, Michael)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Tyler Ward, c/o William Myers, Esq. (Borton, Thomas)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Tyler Ward at Second Address (Borton, Thomas)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Tyler Ward (Borton, Thomas)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to Henry Nguyen, c/o Mike Hanle, Esq. (Borton, Thomas)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Warrant for arrest and Notice issued and delivered to USA (KAM)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Currency($17,400 in United States Currency), Currency(6.19 Bitcoins), Currency(6.23 Bitcoin Cash), filed by United States of America.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jay E Town, US Attorney
Represented By: Thomas E Borton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Henry Long Nguyen
Represented By: Michael P Hanle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?