Underwood et al v. Gulley et al
Plaintiff: Anna L Hill, Anthony Underwood, Melvin Nevett, Shirley Cotton, Paul Garrett and Alzelda Richardson
Defendant: David Vance, Wanda Taylor, Cynthia Donald, Chester Porter, Donna Thigpen, Ron Marshall, Kenneth E Gulley, Johnnie Mae Lassiter, Jesse Matthews and Cleophus King
Case Number: 2:2018cv01310
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. For the reasons stated in the memorandum opinion filed contemporaneously with this order (Doc. 17), the Court denies the plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on August 24, 2018. (Haikala, Madeline)
August 24, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION discussing the reasons why the plaintiffs have not established that they are entitled to a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on August 24, 2018. (Haikala, Madeline)
August 22, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by R Shan Paden on behalf of Kenneth E Gulley (Paden, R)
August 21, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #1 Complaint, by Shirley Cotton, Paul Garrett, Anna L Hill, Melvin Nevett, Alzelda Richardson, Anthony Underwood. filed by Shirley Cotton, Paul Garrett, Anna L Hill, Melvin Nevett, Alzelda Richardson, Anthony Underwood (Rice, Richard)
August 21, 2018 Filing 14 Evidentiary Material re: #13 Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S1 - Bessemer City Council Resolution No. 909-18, #2 Exhibit S2 - Bessemer City Council Resolution No. 1020-18)(Perkins, Alfred)
August 21, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Cynthia Donald, Kenneth E Gulley, Cleophus King, Ron Marshall, Jesse Matthews, Chester Porter, Wanda Taylor, Donna Thigpen, David Vance. (Perkins, Alfred)
August 21, 2018 Filing 12 Brief re Motion Hearing, #8 Brief filed by Shirley Cotton, Paul Garrett, Anna L Hill, Melvin Nevett, Alzelda Richardson, Anthony Underwood. (Rice, Richard)
August 20, 2018 Filing 11 Defendants' Exhibit List re 8/20/2018 Preliminary Injunction Hearing. (YMB)
August 20, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala: Motion Hearing held on 8/20/2018 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Paul Garrett, Shirley Cotton, Anthony Underwood, Melvin Nevett, Anna L Hill, Alzelda Richardson. (Court Reporter Julie Martin.) (YMB)
August 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alfred H Perkins, Jr on behalf of Cynthia Donald, Kenneth E Gulley, Cleophus King, Ron Marshall, Jesse Matthews, Chester Porter, Wanda Taylor, Donna Thigpen, David Vance (Perkins, Alfred)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER - Plaintiffs have filed a motion for preliminary injunction. (Doc. 2). The Court will receive evidence and hear arguments regarding the plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction on Monday, August 20, 2018, at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 7B, Hugo L. Black U.S. Courthouse, 1729 5th Ave. N., Birmingham, AL 35203. Plaintiffs shall file witness and exhibit lists by 4:00 PM, Saturday, August 18, 2018. The list of witnesses shall contain the name and address of each witness with a brief summary of anticipated testimony. The list of exhibits shall identify each exhibit with specificity. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/20/2018. (KEK)
August 20, 2018 Filing 8 Brief re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Shirley Cotton, Paul Garrett, Anna L Hill, Melvin Nevett, Alzelda Richardson, Anthony Underwood. (Rice, Richard)
August 18, 2018 Filing 7 Witness List by Melvin Nevett, Alzelda Richardson, Anthony Underwood. (Rice, Richard)
August 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala: Telephone Conference held on 8/17/2018. (Court Reporter Margaret Wasmund.) (YMB)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER - The Court SETS this matter for a telephone conference at 4:30 PM on August 17, 2018. Counsel of record shall please dial 877-810-9415 and enter access code 5036215 to participate in the call. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/17/2018. (KEK)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/17/2018. (KEK)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. Please us case number 2:18-cv-01310-MHH on all subsequent pleadings. (AFS)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cynthia Donald, Kenneth E Gulley, Cleophus King, Johnnie Mae Lassiter, Ron Marshall, Jesse Matthews, Chester Porter, Wanda Taylor, Donna Thigpen, David Vance given to Plaintiff for service. (AFS)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Shirley Cotton, Paul Garrett, Anna L Hill, Melvin Nevett, Alzelda Richardson, Anthony Underwood. (AFS)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Cynthia Donald, Kenneth E Gulley, Cleophus King, Johnnie Mae Lassiter, Ron Marshall, Jesse Matthews, Chester Porter, Wanda Taylor, Donna Thigpen, David Vance (Filing fee $ 400.00)(ALND B4601091369), filed by Shirley Cotton, Paul Garrett, Anthony Underwood, Melvin Nevett, Anna L Hill, Alzelda Richardson.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Underwood et al v. Gulley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna L Hill
Represented By: Richard Allan Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Underwood
Represented By: Richard Allan Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Nevett
Represented By: Richard Allan Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Cotton
Represented By: Richard Allan Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Garrett
Represented By: Richard Allan Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alzelda Richardson
Represented By: Richard Allan Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Vance
Represented By: Alfred H Perkins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Taylor
Represented By: Alfred H Perkins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Donald
Represented By: Alfred H Perkins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester Porter
Represented By: Alfred H Perkins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Thigpen
Represented By: Alfred H Perkins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Marshall
Represented By: Alfred H Perkins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth E Gulley
Represented By: R Shan Paden
Represented By: Alfred H Perkins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnnie Mae Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Matthews
Represented By: Alfred H Perkins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleophus King
Represented By: Alfred H Perkins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?