Coker v. Norfolk Southern Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Steffany Powell Coker
Defendant: Todd Reynolds, Norfolk Southern Corporation and Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01364
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than November 26, 2018. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after November 26, 2018. A status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 am on November 14, 2018, in chambers. The status conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/15/18. (MRR, )
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Todd Reynolds, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc, Norfolk Southern Corporation. Any opposition to the motion shall be filed no later than Nov. 2, 2018. Any reply shall be filed no later than Nov. 16, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/15/2015. (PMA)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 Brief re #10 MOTION to Dismiss In Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc, Todd Reynolds. (McGivaren, Crawford)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc, Todd Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(McGivaren, Crawford)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/11/2018. (PMA)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Pro Hac Vice Application by Alex S. Drummond for Defendants by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc, Todd Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Alex S. Drummond for Defendants)(Turner, Michael)
October 10, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3192471 (B4601092653). (Turner, Michael) Modified on 10/11/2018 (MRR, ).
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to file a responsive pleading, but only to the extent that the responsive pleading must be filed no later than October 12, 2018. To the extent that it seeks a longer extension, the motion is denied. No further extension of this deadline will be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/3/2018. (PMA)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Motion is RIPE 10/2/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc, Todd Reynolds. (Turner, Michael)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steffany Powell Coker. Norfolk Southern Corporation served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018; Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (KEK)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc, Todd Reynolds, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
August 27, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3160262 (B4601091557). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steffany Powell Coker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(MRR, ). (Wilkinson, Cynthia) Modified on 8/30/2018 (MRR, ).
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Steffany Powell Coker. (MRR, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steffany Powell Coker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coker v. Norfolk Southern Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Reynolds
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Turner
Represented By: Alex S Drummond
Represented By: Sydney F Frazier, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Turner
Represented By: Alex S Drummond
Represented By: Sydney F Frazier, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc
Represented By: Crawford S McGivaren, Jr
Represented By: Michael E Turner
Represented By: Alex S Drummond
Represented By: Sydney F Frazier, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steffany Powell Coker
Represented By: Cynthia F Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?