Hanover Insurance Company, The v. BASF Corporation
Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company, The
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv01418
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by BASF Corporation. (Harris, Erin)
October 4, 2018 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 12 OPPOSITION to #4 BASF Corp's Motion to Dismiss filed by Hanover Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Keenan, George) Modified docket text to reflect title of doc on 10/3/2018 (MRR, ).
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/28/2019. (PMA)
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Rule 26 Conference and Report Deadlines Motion is RIPE 9/28/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by BASF Corporation, The Hanover Insurance Company. (Harris, Erin) Modified docket text to reflect all filers on 9/28/2018 (MRR, ).
September 26, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Status Conference held in chambers on 9/26/2018. (ASL)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE to remind parties of consent conference scheduled for 10:30 AM on Wednesday, 9/26/18; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, by Tuesday, 9/25/18, the conference will be cancelled (ASL)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hanover Insurance Company, The. filed by Hanover Insurance Company, The (Keenan, George)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/11/2018. (ASL)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by the magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than October 22, 2018. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after October 22, 2018. A status conference with the magistrate judge is hereby SET for 10:30 AM on Wednesday, September 26, 2018, in chambers. The conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted at least twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/11/2018. (KEK)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by BASF Corporation. The plaintiff may file any opposition within 21 days. Any reply shall be filed within 14 days after any opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/11/2018. (PMA)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Opinion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Brief)(Harris, Erin)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BASF Corporation. filed by BASF Corporation (Harris, Erin)
August 31, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3164705 (ALNDCLERK 18-0030). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BASF Corporation from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2018-902988., filed by BASF Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(MRR, ). (Harris, Erin) Modified on 9/4/2018 (MRR, ).
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BASF Corporation from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2018-902988., filed by BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanover Insurance Company, The v. BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company, The
Represented By: L Graves Stiff, III
Represented By: George Matthew Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Erin Abigail Harris
Represented By: Clyde W Steineker
Represented By: F M Haston, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?