Reynolds v. Behrman Capital IV L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Reynolds
Defendant: AXA Private Capital I, LP, Behrman Brothers Management Corporation, Midcap Financial SBIC, LP, The Governor and Company of the Bank of Iceland, William M. Matthes, Gregory J. Chiate, Metlife Insurance Company of Connecticut, Stepstone Private Equity Partners III, LP, Partners Group Global Opportunities Subholding Limited, AXA Primary Fund America IV LP, Mintz,Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C., PE Holding USD GMBH, Simon Lonergan, Pradyut Shah, Behrman Capital IV L.P., Mark V. Grimes, Gary Dieber, Portfolio Advisors Secondary Fund, LP, Partners Group Direct Investments 2006, LP, Global Fund Partners II, LP, Michael Rappaport, Behrman Brothers IV L.L.C., Greg M. Behrman, Core Americas/Global Holdings, LP, Jeffrey S. Wu, Kimberly B. Behrman Trust, ASF III Blue Note Limited, Douglas E. Behrman Trust, Amanda Zeitlin and Varma Mutual Pension Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv01453
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #7 MOTION for Reconsideration the court DENIES his motion to reconsider September 6, 2018 order. Accordingly, the court DENIES the request to certify its order for interlocutory appeal. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/2/2018. (TLM, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Mintz,Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C. re: #10 Response in Opposition to Motion (In Support of its Motion to Dismiss) filed by Mintz,Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C.. (Gilchrist, Wesley)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thomas E. Reynolds. (Bensinger, Bill)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 Opposition to re #7 filed by Mintz,Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gilchrist, Wesley)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER. The court DIRECTS Defendant to file its response to Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Reconsider on or before October 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/21/2018. (RLW)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration re #1 Order,, by Thomas E. Reynolds. (Bensinger, Bill)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to #3 Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C.'s Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response is due on or before October 4, 2018, and Mintz Levin's reply, if necessary, is due or on before October 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/19/2018. (RLW)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Motions to Dismiss by Thomas E. Reynolds. (Bensinger, Bill)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: In light of the court's #1 remand order, the court reminds the parties that a response to Defendant Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C.'s #3 motion to dismiss is due on or before September 20, 2018, and a reply to the response, if necessary, is due on or before September 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/6/18. (SAC )
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss (and Memo in Support of), by Mintz,Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(SAC )
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL; case number 01-cv-2018-900889. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #(4) Joinder of Midcap, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(SAC )
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER severing case 2:18-cv-514-ACA into three cases: (1) Counts One through Seven; (2) Counts Eight through Ten; and (3) Counts Eleven through Thirteen. The court REMANDS Counts Eight through Ten to the Jefferson County Circuit Court. The court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to keep Counts One through Seven under the civil action number 2:18-cv-514-ACA and to create a new civil action number for Counts Eleven through Thirteen (2:18-cv-1453-ACA). The court WAIVES the filing fee for 2:18-cv-1453-ACA. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/6/18. (SAC )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Behrman Capital IV L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Reynolds
Represented By: Richard E Smith
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Bill D Bensinger
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Jonathan W Macklem
Represented By: Daniel D Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXA Private Capital I, LP
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Behrman Brothers Management Corporation
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midcap Financial SBIC, LP
Represented By: Charles Walton Prueter
Represented By: Larry B Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Governor and Company of the Bank of Iceland
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Matthes
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Chiate
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metlife Insurance Company of Connecticut
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stepstone Private Equity Partners III, LP
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partners Group Global Opportunities Subholding Limited
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXA Primary Fund America IV LP
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mintz,Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C.
Represented By: Adrienne K Walker
Represented By: Brian Dunphy
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Michael S Gardener
Represented By: Samuel H Franklin
Represented By: Amie Adelia Vague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PE Holding USD GMBH
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Lonergan
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pradyut Shah
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Behrman Capital IV L.P.
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark V. Grimes
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Dieber
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Advisors Secondary Fund, LP
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partners Group Direct Investments 2006, LP
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Fund Partners II, LP
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rappaport
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Behrman Brothers IV L.L.C.
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg M. Behrman
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Americas/Global Holdings, LP
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S. Wu
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly B. Behrman Trust
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASF III Blue Note Limited
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas E. Behrman Trust
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Zeitlin
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varma Mutual Pension Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard D Batchelder
Represented By: Gregory L Demers
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Represented By: Andrew Devore
Represented By: Ryan D Thompson
Represented By: John A Earnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?