Norman v. Jefferson County Housing Authority

Plaintiff: Chiquita Norman
Defendant: Jefferson County Housing Authority
Case Number: 2:2018cv01454
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Jefferson County Housing Authority del to USM (KAM)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT Second Notice of Availability by Chiquita Norman. filed by Chiquita Norman (Forton, Michael)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT Notice of Availability by Chiquita Norman. filed by Chiquita Norman (Forton, Michael)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Plaintiff has submitted a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Doc. # 2). The court finds that Plaintiff is indigent, and the Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. # 2) is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file this action without prepayment of a fee. Additionally, Plaintiff has filed an Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Doc. # 3). The court plans to set a status conference to discuss the Motion on an expedited basis.1 To that end, Plaintiff SHALL notify Defendant and/or counsel for Defendant of the Motion and the courts plan to set an expedited status conference. On or before September 10, 2018, Plaintiff SHALL confer with Defendant and/or counsel for Defendant regarding dates during the week of September 10, 2018, on which they are both available for a status conference. Plaintiff SHALL file a notice with the court regarding each sides availability on or before September 11, 2018. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/7/2018. (KEK)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Chiquita Norman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(KAM)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Chiquita Norman. (KAM)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jefferson County Housing Authority, filed by Chiquita Norman.(KAM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2018: #1 Affidavit) (KAM, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2018: #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (KAM, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. Jefferson County Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chiquita Norman
Represented By: Michael Lee Forton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?