Roche Diagnostics Corporation et al v. Priority Healthcare Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Roche Diabetes Care Inc and Roche Diagnostics Corporation
Defendant: Tombigbee Pharmacy LLC, Ashley Tigrett, Jasper Express Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Medpoint Pharmacy Benefit Managers, Vincent Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy 2 LLC, Melissa Sheffield, Priority Care Pharmacy Solutions LLC, Christopher Daniel Knotts, Carbon Hill Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Medical Park Discount Pharmacy LLC, Medpoint Advantage LLC, B&K Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Konie Minga, Priority Healthcare Corporation, Phillip Anthony Minga, Priority Care Pharmacy Services LLC, Vincent Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Medical Park Pharmacy Inc, Burns Discount Drug Store LLC, Kimberly P Carson, William H Austin, Ozark Family Pharmacy LLC, Burns Drugstore Inc, Wesley Minga, Vickers Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy at Cotton Gin Point LLC, Bowies Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Amory Discount Pharmacy LLC, Daniel Baker, Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Samuel Phillip Carson, Amory Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Geneva Oswalt, Priority Care Medical Supply LLC, Main Street Drugs LLC and Bowies Priority Care Pharmacy LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01479
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Reset Hearings: Status Conference is hereby RESET for November 15, 2018, at 1:00 p.m., in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L. Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, Alabama before Magistrate Judge T. Michael Putnam. (JLC)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TEXT ORDER granting #45 Motion to Reschedule Status Conference and Hearing on Motion to Stay. Due to unavoidable conflicts with the court's schedule, it is not possible to hold the hearing in advance of November 14, 2018. The Status Conference and Hearing on Motion to Stay previously scheduled for November 16, 2018 at 10:00AM by Doc. 44 is RESET for November 15, 2018 at 1:00PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L. Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, Alabama before Magistrate Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Defendants' are hereby given until November 16, 2018 to respond to the subpoenas at issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on November 9, 2018.(TNC)
November 8, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION for Protective Order by Amory Discount Pharmacy LLC, Amory Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Express Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Daniel Baker, Bowies Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Bowies Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Burns Discount Drug Store LLC, Burns Drugstore Inc, Carbon Hill Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Jasper Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Christopher Daniel Knotts, Main Street Drugs LLC, Medical Park Discount Pharmacy LLC, Medical Park Pharmacy Inc, Medpoint Advantage LLC, Medpoint Pharmacy Benefit Managers, Konie Minga, Phillip Anthony Minga, Wesley Minga, Geneva Oswalt, Ozark Family Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Medical Supply LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy 2 LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Services LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Solutions LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy at Cotton Gin Point LLC, Priority Healthcare Corporation, Melissa Sheffield, Ashley Tigrett, Tombigbee Pharmacy LLC, Vickers Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Priority Care Pharmacy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena Inventory, #2 Exhibit 2 - Representative Bank Subpoena, #3 Exhibit 3 - Representative Wholesaler Subpoena, #4 Exhibit 4 - Representative PBM Subpoena)(Gilchrist, Wesley)
November 8, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Scott on behalf of William H Austin (Scott, John)
November 8, 2018 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION TO RESCHEDULE STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Potter, Geoffrey)
November 7, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION TO RESCHEDULE STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY by Amory Discount Pharmacy LLC, Amory Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Express Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Daniel Baker, Bowies Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Bowies Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Burns Discount Drug Store LLC, Burns Drugstore Inc, Carbon Hill Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Jasper Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Christopher Daniel Knotts, Main Street Drugs LLC, Medical Park Discount Pharmacy LLC, Medical Park Pharmacy Inc, Medpoint Advantage LLC, Medpoint Pharmacy Benefit Managers, Konie Minga, Phillip Anthony Minga, Wesley Minga, Geneva Oswalt, Ozark Family Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Medical Supply LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy 2 LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Services LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Solutions LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy at Cotton Gin Point LLC, Priority Healthcare Corporation, Melissa Sheffield, Ashley Tigrett, Tombigbee Pharmacy LLC, Vickers Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Priority Care Pharmacy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 subpoena chart, #2 Exhibit 2 subpoenas, #3 Exhibit 3 subpoenas, #4 Exhibit 4 subpoenas)(Prater, Harlan)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER setting motion hearing #36 Motion to Stay. A status conference and hearing on the motion to stay shall be held on November 16, 2018, at 10:00AM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L. Black U.S. Courthouse, Birmingham, Alabama, before Magistrate Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on November 7, 2018.(TNC)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REFERRING #36 MOTION for Discovery Stay and for Expedited Status Conference to Magistrate Judge Putnam. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/7/2018. (JLC)
November 6, 2018 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Stay re #22 Order,, filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation Draft, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter to R. Culp III, #3 Exhibit 3 - Current Trade Email)(Potter, Geoffrey)
November 6, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine E Gwinn-Ross on behalf of Amory Discount Pharmacy LLC, Amory Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Express Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Daniel Baker, Bowies Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Bowies Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Burns Discount Drug Store LLC, Burns Drugstore Inc, Carbon Hill Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Jasper Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Christopher Daniel Knotts, Main Street Drugs LLC, Medical Park Discount Pharmacy LLC, Medical Park Pharmacy Inc, Medpoint Advantage LLC, Medpoint Pharmacy Benefit Managers, Konie Minga, Phillip Anthony Minga, Wesley Minga, Geneva Oswalt, Ozark Family Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Medical Supply LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy 2 LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Services LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Solutions LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy at Cotton Gin Point LLC, Priority Healthcare Corporation, Melissa Sheffield, Ashley Tigrett, Tombigbee Pharmacy LLC, Vickers Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Priority Care Pharmacy LLC (Gwinn-Ross, Christine)
November 5, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P Doss on behalf of Amory Discount Pharmacy LLC, Amory Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Express Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Daniel Baker, Bowies Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Bowies Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Burns Discount Drug Store LLC, Burns Drugstore Inc, Carbon Hill Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Jasper Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Christopher Daniel Knotts, Main Street Drugs LLC, Medical Park Discount Pharmacy LLC, Medical Park Pharmacy Inc, Medpoint Advantage LLC, Medpoint Pharmacy Benefit Managers, Konie Minga, Phillip Anthony Minga, Wesley Minga, Geneva Oswalt, Ozark Family Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Medical Supply LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy 2 LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Services LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Solutions LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy at Cotton Gin Point LLC, Priority Healthcare Corporation, Melissa Sheffield, Ashley Tigrett, Tombigbee Pharmacy LLC, Vickers Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Priority Care Pharmacy LLC (Doss, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley B Gilchrist on behalf of Amory Discount Pharmacy LLC, Amory Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Express Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Daniel Baker, Bowies Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Bowies Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Burns Discount Drug Store LLC, Burns Drugstore Inc, Carbon Hill Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Jasper Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Christopher Daniel Knotts, Main Street Drugs LLC, Medical Park Discount Pharmacy LLC, Medical Park Pharmacy Inc, Medpoint Advantage LLC, Medpoint Pharmacy Benefit Managers, Konie Minga, Phillip Anthony Minga, Wesley Minga, Geneva Oswalt, Ozark Family Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Medical Supply LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy 2 LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Services LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Solutions LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy at Cotton Gin Point LLC, Priority Healthcare Corporation, Melissa Sheffield, Ashley Tigrett, Tombigbee Pharmacy LLC, Vickers Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Priority Care Pharmacy LLC (Gilchrist, Wesley)
November 5, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Jackson R Sharman, III on behalf of Amory Discount Pharmacy LLC, Amory Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Express Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Daniel Baker, Bowies Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Bowies Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Burns Discount Drug Store LLC, Burns Drugstore Inc, Carbon Hill Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Jasper Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Christopher Daniel Knotts, Main Street Drugs LLC, Medical Park Discount Pharmacy LLC, Medical Park Pharmacy Inc, Medpoint Advantage LLC, Medpoint Pharmacy Benefit Managers, Konie Minga, Phillip Anthony Minga, Wesley Minga, Geneva Oswalt, Ozark Family Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Medical Supply LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy 2 LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Services LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Solutions LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy at Cotton Gin Point LLC, Priority Healthcare Corporation, Melissa Sheffield, Ashley Tigrett, Tombigbee Pharmacy LLC, Vickers Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Priority Care Pharmacy LLC (Sharman, Jackson)
November 5, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan Irby Prater, IV on behalf of Amory Discount Pharmacy LLC, Amory Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Express Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Daniel Baker, Bowies Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Bowies Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Burns Discount Drug Store LLC, Burns Drugstore Inc, Carbon Hill Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Jasper Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Christopher Daniel Knotts, Main Street Drugs LLC, Medical Park Discount Pharmacy LLC, Medical Park Pharmacy Inc, Medpoint Advantage LLC, Medpoint Pharmacy Benefit Managers, Konie Minga, Phillip Anthony Minga, Wesley Minga, Geneva Oswalt, Ozark Family Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Medical Supply LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy 2 LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Services LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Solutions LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy at Cotton Gin Point LLC, Priority Healthcare Corporation, Melissa Sheffield, Ashley Tigrett, Tombigbee Pharmacy LLC, Vickers Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Priority Care Pharmacy LLC (Prater, Harlan)
November 5, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to Stay re #22 Order,, by Amory Discount Pharmacy LLC, Amory Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Express Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Daniel Baker, Bowies Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Bowies Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Burns Discount Drug Store LLC, Burns Drugstore Inc, Carbon Hill Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Jasper Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Christopher Daniel Knotts, Main Street Drugs LLC, Medical Park Discount Pharmacy LLC, Medical Park Pharmacy Inc, Medpoint Advantage LLC, Medpoint Pharmacy Benefit Managers, Konie Minga, Phillip Anthony Minga, Wesley Minga, Geneva Oswalt, Ozark Family Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Medical Supply LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy 2 LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Services LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Solutions LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy at Cotton Gin Point LLC, Priority Healthcare Corporation, Melissa Sheffield, Ashley Tigrett, Tombigbee Pharmacy LLC, Vickers Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Priority Care Pharmacy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Prater, Harlan)
November 1, 2018 Filing 35 STATUS REPORT /JOINT STATUS REPORT by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation (Potter, Geoffrey)
October 26, 2018 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Order to Show Cause for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; Declarations and Memorandum of Law in Support; and Pro Hac Vice Motions served on All Defendants, filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Potter, Geoffrey)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that on or before November 1, 2018, the parties are to file a Joint Status Report updating the Court as to the Status of service of the complaint as set out herein. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/25/2018. (JLC)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/9/2018. (FNC)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/9/2018. (FNC)
October 8, 2018 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Priority Healthcare Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Proposed HIPAA Qualified Protective Order)(Culp, H)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting Motions to Admit H. Richmond Culp (doc. 26), Albert G. Delgadillo (doc. 27), and Stephn K. Otey, Jr. (doc. 28) Pro Hac Vice. The court advises counsel that it may require at least one attorney for each party to be physically present at every hearing and status conference and distance from the courthouse will be no excuse. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/24/18. (MMW)
September 24, 2018 PHV Fee paid for Albert Delgadillo in the amount of $50.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3179749, NDAL receipt #B4601092217. (Delgadillo, Albert) Modified on 9/24/2018 (JLC).
September 24, 2018 PHV Fee paid for Stephen K. Otey in the amount of $50.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3179368, NDAL receipt #B4601092206. (Otey, Stephen) Modified on 9/24/2018 (JLC).
September 24, 2018 PHV Fee paid for H. Richmond Culp in the amount of $50.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3179359, NDAL receipt #B4601092205. (Culp, H) Modified on 9/24/2018 (JLC).
September 21, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephen K. Otey, Jr. by Priority Healthcare Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing)(Wilson, James)
September 21, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Albert G. Delgadillo by Priority Healthcare Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing)(Wilson, James)
September 21, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice H. Richmond Culp, III by Priority Healthcare Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing)(Wilson, James)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS the "Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint." (Doc. 24). For all Defendants properly served as of the date of this Order, the court extends the time to file a responsive pleading to on or before November 16, 2018. For all those Defendants not yet served as of the date of this Order, the court gives them 21 days after service or until November 16, 2018, whichever is later, to file their responsive pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/21/18. (MMW)
September 18, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by Priority Healthcare Corporation. (Wilson, James)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEDIATION ORDER - The court finds this case is appropriate for mediation pursuant to Section IV, paragraph 2 of this courts Alternative Dispute Resolution Plan, adopted November 18, 2014 (the Plan). The parties are DIRECTED to proceed promptly to select a mediator from the Court Panel of Neutrals according to the requirements of the Plan or to select an alternate mediator agreed upon by the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/17/2018. (KEK)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - In the joint status report, the parties explained that they resolved the issues regarding the temporary restraining order, preliminary injunction, and expedited discovery. The court enters this Order to reflect this resolution between the parties, but does not opine as to whether the Plaintiffs met the requirements for a temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction. Additionally, the court CANCELS the hearing scheduled for Monday, September 17, 2018, as the parties resolved the relevant issues in their joint status report. (Doc. 20). Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/17/2018. (KEK)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: After receiving word from counsel that the parties have reached an agreement over the issues involved in the motion for a temporary restraining order, preliminary injunction, and expedited discovery (doc. 4), the court CANCELS the hearing previously scheduled for Monday, September 17, 2018 at 9:00 am. The court will enter the stipulated order by separate entry. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 09/14/2018. (LMG)
September 14, 2018 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT (Jointly Filed) by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and [proposed] Order)(Potter, Geoffrey)
September 12, 2018 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Amory Discount Pharmacy LLC, Amory Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, William H Austin, B&K Express Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Daniel Baker, Bowies Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Bowies Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Burns Discount Drug Store LLC, Burns Drugstore Inc, Carbon Hill Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Kimberly P Carson, Samuel Phillip Carson, Jasper Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Christopher Daniel Knotts, Main Street Drugs LLC, Medical Park Discount Pharmacy LLC, Medical Park Pharmacy Inc, Medpoint Advantage LLC, Medpoint Pharmacy Benefit Managers, Konie Minga, Phillip Anthony Minga, Wesley Minga, Geneva Oswalt, Ozark Family Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Medical Supply LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy 2 LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Services LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Solutions LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy at Cotton Gin Point LLC, Priority Healthcare Corporation, Melissa Sheffield, Ashley Tigrett, Tombigbee Pharmacy LLC, Vickers Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Returned to Plaintiff's attorney for service on this the 12th day of September, 2018. (JLC)
September 12, 2018 Filing 18 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/11/2018, before Judge Karen O. Bowdre. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lindy M. Fuller, Telephone number 205-278-2062. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 10/3/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2018. (JLC)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting Motion to Admit Geoffrey Potter (doc. 12), Aron Fischer (doc 13), and Timothy Gray (doc. 14) Pro Hac Vice. The court advises counsel that it may require at least one attorney for each party to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/12/18. (MMW)
September 12, 2018 PHV Fee paid for Timothy Gray in the amount of $50.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3171216, NDAL receipt #B4601091944. (Canupp, David) Modified on 9/12/2018 (JLC).
September 12, 2018 PHV Fee paid for Aron Fischer in the amount of $50.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3171214, NDAL receipt #B4601091943. (Canupp, David) Modified on 9/12/2018 (JLC).
September 12, 2018 PHV Fee paid for Geoffrey Potter in the amount of $50.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3171210, NDAL receipt #B4601091942. (Canupp, David) Modified on 9/12/2018 (JLC).
September 12, 2018 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3171207, NDAL receipt #B4601091941.(Canupp, David) Modified on 9/12/2018 (JLC).
September 11, 2018 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre: Telephone Conference held on 9/11/2018. Geoff Potter, Aron Fischer and David Canupp, for plffs and Al Delgadillo and Rick Culp for defs participated in phone conference. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Lindy Fuller.) (FNC)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER. Telephone Conference set for Tuesday, September 11, 2018 at 03:30 PM before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. The call in information has been provided to plffs local counsel. Local counsel has been directed to provide the information to all other parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/11/2018. (FNC)
September 11, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Timothy Gray by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Canupp, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Aron Fischer by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Canupp, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Geoffrey Potter by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Canupp, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Discovery [Dkt. No. 10] by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Canupp, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 Brief re #4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Canupp, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Robert E. Haley, III filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21)(Canupp, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Geoffrey Potter filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Errata 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28)(Canupp, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Kelly Clawson filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Canupp, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Kerri McAleavey filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Canupp, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Kimberly Ober filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Canupp, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Canupp, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Karon O. Bowdre. Please use case number 2:18-cv-1479-KOB on all subsequent pleadings. (KEK)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (KEK)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amory Discount Pharmacy LLC, Amory Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, William H Austin, B&K Express Care Pharmacy LLC, B&K Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Daniel Baker, Bowies Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Bowies Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Burns Discount Drug Store LLC, Burns Drugstore Inc, Carbon Hill Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Kimberly P Carson, Samuel Phillip Carson, Jasper Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Christopher Daniel Knotts, Main Street Drugs LLC, Medical Park Discount Pharmacy LLC, Medical Park Pharmacy Inc, Medpoint Advantage LLC, Medpoint Pharmacy Benefit Managers, Konie Minga, Phillip Anthony Minga, Wesley Minga, Geneva Oswalt, Ozark Family Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Medical Supply LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy 2 LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Services LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy Solutions LLC, Priority Care Pharmacy at Cotton Gin Point LLC, Priority Healthcare Corporation, Melissa Sheffield, Ashley Tigrett, Tombigbee Pharmacy LLC, Vickers Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Express Care Pharmacy LLC, Vincent Priority Care Pharmacy LLC, filed by Roche Diabetes Care Inc, Roche Diagnostics Corporation.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roche Diagnostics Corporation et al v. Priority Healthcare Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tombigbee Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Tigrett
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasper Express Care Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&K Priority Care Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medpoint Pharmacy Benefit Managers
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Express Care Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Care Pharmacy 2 LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Sheffield
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Care Pharmacy Solutions LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Daniel Knotts
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carbon Hill Express Care Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Park Discount Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medpoint Advantage LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&K Express Care Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konie Minga
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: H Richmond Culp
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: James P Wilson, Jr
Represented By: Albert G Delgadillo
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Stephen K Otey
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Anthony Minga
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Care Pharmacy Services LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Priority Care Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Park Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burns Discount Drug Store LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly P Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H Austin
Represented By: Joshua S Thompson
Represented By: John W Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozark Family Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burns Drugstore Inc
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Minga
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickers Priority Care Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Care Pharmacy at Cotton Gin Point LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowies Express Care Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amory Discount Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Baker
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Care Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Phillip Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amory Priority Care Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geneva Oswalt
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Care Medical Supply LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Street Drugs LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowies Priority Care Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Jackson R Sharman, III
Represented By: Christine E Gwinn-Ross
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roche Diabetes Care Inc
Represented By: Aron Fischer
Represented By: David J Canupp
Represented By: Geoffrey Potter
Represented By: Timothy Gray
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roche Diagnostics Corporation
Represented By: Aron Fischer
Represented By: David J Canupp
Represented By: Geoffrey Potter
Represented By: Timothy Gray
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?