Dasmen Residential LLC v. Ferguson

Plaintiff: Dasmen Residential LLC
Defendant: Davetta Ferguson
Case Number: 2:2018cv01496
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
0 Judge: Abdul K Kallon
1 Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2018 10 Mail (doc 8) Returned as Undeliverable - Marked RETURN TO SENDER, ATTEMPTED-NOT KNOWN, UNABLE TO FORWARD. Mail sent to Davetta Ferguson. (KWC)
October 10, 2018 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Davetta Ferguson Order of Reassignment #6 (Attempted Not Known) (AFS)
October 4, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER this matter is REMANDED back to the Shelby County, Alabama Court. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/4/2018. (AFS)
October 3, 2018 7 Notice of Reassignment- The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 2:18-cv-1496-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. (MRR, )
October 3, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT- The court entered an order directing the deft to establish facts that would support the allegations of diversity; In response to the court's order, the deft filed a document (Doc #5 ) that does not make any allegations relating to diversity of citizenship and does not provide any facts from which the court may ascertain the citizenship of the members of the plaintiff limited liability company; The undersigned is without jurisdiction to remand this action; The case is now due to be assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/3/18. (MRR, )
September 28, 2018 5 Objections and Responses to Report and Recommendation Pursuant to 28 USC 636(b)(1) filed by Davetta Ferguson. (MRR, )
September 18, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER- The deft's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis(Doc #2 ) is GRANTED; The deft is given 14 days from the date this order is entered to amend the petition for removal in order to cure the failure to properly allege diversity jurisdiction; Further instructions within. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/18/18. (MRR, )
September 13, 2018 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
September 13, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 9/13/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Davetta Ferguson. (KEK)
September 13, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Davetta Ferguson from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Alabama, case number 58-dv-2018-900470, filed by Davetta Ferguson.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dasmen Residential LLC v. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dasmen Residential LLC
Represented By: Jim M Sandefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davetta Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?