Johnson et al v. Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Patsy Johnson and David Johnson
Defendant: Ray Williams, Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation and Bob Pitts
Case Number: 2:2018cv01510
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel 10-10-18 PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY DEFENDANTS COUNSEL, #18 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS MOTION COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO COMPLY WITH RULE 26(a)(1)(A)(ii), FED.R.CIV.P. filed by David Johnson, Patsy Johnson. (Rutledge, W)
October 19, 2018 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by David Johnson, Patsy Johnson. (Rutledge, W)
October 19, 2018 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Robinson, James)
October 15, 2018 Filing 21 Opposition to re #17 Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify Defendants' Counsel and Motion to Compel filed by Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation, Bob Pitts, Ray Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robinson, James)
October 12, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation. (Robinson, James)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: The court finds as moot #9 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Deposition Notices to the Plaintiffs pursuant to the Defendants' agreement to withdraw the deposition notices. (Doc. 16). Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/10/18. (CAK2)
October 10, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS MOTION COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO COMPLY WITH RULE 26(a)(1)(A)(ii), FED.R.CIV.P. by David Johnson, Patsy Johnson. (Rutledge, W)
October 10, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel 10-10-18 PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY DEFENDANTS COUNSEL by David Johnson, Patsy Johnson. (Rutledge, W)
October 4, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Deposition Notices filed by Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation, Bob Pitts, Ray Williams. (Robinson, James)
October 3, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by David Johnson, Patsy Johnson. (Rutledge, W)
October 1, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge Chief Karon O Bowdre. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:18-cv-1510-KOB for all subsequent pleadings. (AFS)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline for #11 Motion to Remand to State Court and #12 Notice Regarding Intent to Request Sanctions. Any opposition to the motion must be filed by October 12, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 09/28/2018. (CLS2)
September 28, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE by David Johnson, Patsy Johnson re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #1 Notice of Removal, (Rutledge, W)
September 28, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by David Johnson, Patsy Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Affidavit David Johnson)(Rutledge, W)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER regarding #9 Motion to Strike. Because there appears these deposition notices could have been served in error based on the timing of the removal, the parties are ORDERED to confer regarding Plaintiffs' position that the deposition notices at issue are premature under Rule 26(d)(1), and file a joint status report regarding the status of the dispute by October 4, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 09/27/2018. (CLS2)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Deposition Notices by David Johnson, Patsy Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rutledge, W)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/24/2018. (AFS)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than November 5, 2018. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after November 5, 2018. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:15 a.m. on October 23, 2018. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/24/2018. (AFS)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline #5 Motion to Dismiss. Any opposition to the motion must be filed by October 5, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 09/22/2018. (CLS2)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Bob Pitts, Ray Williams. (Robinson, James)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation.(Robinson, James)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation (AFS)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-cv-2018-903146.00., filed by Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Johnson
Represented By: W Eugene Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Johnson
Represented By: W Eugene Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Williams
Represented By: Joseph B Mays, Jr
Represented By: James Hunter Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairway Independent Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Joseph B Mays, Jr
Represented By: James Hunter Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Pitts
Represented By: Joseph B Mays, Jr
Represented By: James Hunter Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?