Berry v. Norfolk Southern Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Tomaneka Berry
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation and Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01591
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc.(Geisler, Kimberly)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tomaneka Berry. Norfolk Southern Corporation served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (KAM)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Defendant's #6 motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is GRANTED. Defendant SHALL respond to the complaint by November 21, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 11/07/2018. (SUH)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc. filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc (Geisler, Kimberly)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Corporation. filed by Norfolk Southern Corporation (Geisler, Kimberly)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 11/7/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc. (Geisler, Kimberly)
November 2, 2018 Filing fee: $ 200.00, receipt number B4601093192 (TLM, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Tomaneka Berry as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc. (KAM)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc. del to USM (KAM)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to pay a partial filing fee of $200.00 by November 1, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 10/1/2018. (JLC)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 9/28/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Tomaneka Berry. (KAM)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc, filed by Tomaneka Berry.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Norfolk Southern Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Represented By: Kimberly W Geisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc
Represented By: Kimberly W Geisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomaneka Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?