McGuire v. IhangTVs.com, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Burton McGuire
Defendant: IhangTVs.com, LLC and Ferlando Parker
Case Number: 2:2018cv01596
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer IhangTVs.com, LLC answer due 12/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/26/2018. (AFS)
November 21, 2018 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 11/21/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by IhangTVs.com, LLC, Ferlando Parker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brannen, Franklin)
November 21, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Franklin P Brannen, Jr on behalf of IhangTVs.com, LLC, Ferlando Parker (Brannen, Franklin)
November 15, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Hearing re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion is RIPE 11/15/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Burton McGuire. (Macklem, Jonathan)
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Burton McGuire. Ferlando Parker served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Macklem, Jonathan)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Burton McGuire. IhangTVs.com, LLC served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Macklem, Jonathan)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to IhangTVs.com, LLC, Ferlando Parker - Unclaimed. (AFS)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 Alias Summons Issued as to IhangTVs.com, LLC, Ferlando Parker mailed certified mail. (AFS)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline for #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Any opposition to the motion must be filed within fourteen days after the defendant appears. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 10/12/2018. (CLS2) Modified on 10/12/2018 (KEK).
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Macklem, Jonathan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Burton McGuire. (Macklem, Jonathan)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to IhangTVs.com, LLC, Ferlando Parker mailed certified mail. (AFS)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Burton McGuire. (Macklem, Jonathan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
September 28, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400.00, (ALNDCLERK 19-001) receipt_number 1126-3184677. related document #1 COMPLAINT against IhangTVs.com, LLC, Ferlando Parker, filed by Burton McGuire. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC). (Macklem, Jonathan) Modified on 10/1/2018 (AFS).
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against IhangTVs.com, LLC, Ferlando Parker, filed by Burton McGuire. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGuire v. IhangTVs.com, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burton McGuire
Represented By: Jonathan W Macklem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IhangTVs.com, LLC
Represented By: Franklin P Brannen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferlando Parker
Represented By: Franklin P Brannen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?