Epperson v. Evonik Corporation
Plaintiff: Ray Epperson
Defendant: Evonik Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv01612
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John H England, III: Telephone Conference held on 11/26/2018; Attorney Allen Schreiber present by phone for pltf; Attorney Patrick Lail present by phone for dft; consent process discussed; conf. adj. (AVC)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 12/9/2018. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 12/9/2018. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:15 a.m. on 11/26/2018. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/25/2018. (JLC) Modified on 11/28/2018 (AFS).
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Evonik Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Initial Status Letter 09-10-14, #2 Exhibit 2 - FMLA Approval Letter 09-29-14, #3 Exhibit 3 - FMLA Extension Letter 10-09-14, #4 Exhibit 4 - FMLA Extension Letter 10-15-14, #5 Exhibit 5 - FMLA Exhaustion Letter 11-20-14, #6 Exhibit 6 - FMLA Letter 11-17-17, #7 Exhibit 7 - CareWorks Claim File, #8 Exhibit 8 - Leave Denial Letter 12-08-17, #9 Exhibit 9 - Separation Letter 12-14-17)(Lail, Patrick)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #7 and #8 Motions to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorneys Stanford G. Wilson and Patrick Lee Lail, but with the understanding and on the condition they pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless they have already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/23/2018. (AVC)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Evonik Corporation. filed by Evonik Corporation (Brown, Whitney)
October 22, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $50.00, (ALND B4601092921) receipt number 1126-3201146. (Brown, Whitney) Modified on 10/23/2018 (AFS).
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick Lee Lail Motion is RIPE 10/22/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Evonik Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Court Admissions)(Brown, Whitney)
October 22, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $50.00, receipt number 1126-3201111 (ALND B4601092920). (Brown, Whitney) Modified on 10/23/2018 (AFS).
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stanford Glenn Wilson Motion is RIPE 10/22/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Evonik Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Court Admissions)(Brown, Whitney)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Evonik Corporation c/o Corporation Service Company, Inc. served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (AFS)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Evonik Corporation served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (AFS)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Evonik Corporation mailed certified mail. (AFS)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Ray Epperson. (Schreiber, J)
October 2, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400.00, (ALND B460109424) receipt_number 1126-3186871. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Evonik Corporation, filed by Ray Epperson.(AFS). (Schreiber, J) Modified on 10/2/2018 (AFS).
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE regarding consent of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Evonik Corporation, filed by Ray Epperson.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epperson v. Evonik Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Epperson
Represented By: J Allen Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evonik Corporation
Represented By: Patrick L Lail
Represented By: Whitney R Brown
Represented By: Stanford G Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?