Brickie v. Region's Bank et al

Plaintiff: Angela Brickie
Defendant: Region's Bank, Steven Castleberry and Wayne Key
Case Number: 2:2018cv01613
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER This case is set for a Scheduling Conference on Friday, December 14, 2018, at 11:00 AM, courtroom 6B, Hugo L. Black U.S. Courthouse, 1729 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama 35203, before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/27/18. (SAC )
November 26, 2018 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter dated Oct. 15, 2018, #2 Exhibit Email thread dated Nov. 5-8, 2018, #3 Exhibit Email from November 20, 2018)(Malcom, Brian)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/19/18. (SAC )
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/13/2018. (TLM, )
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/13/2018. (TLM, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 13 Notice of Reassignment-Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Annemarie Carney Axon. Please use case number 2:18-cv-1613-ACA on all subsequent pleadings. (MRR, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE- Part Four of Four by Angela Brickie (MRR, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE- Part Three of Four by Angela Brickie (MRR, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE- Part Two of Four by Angela Brickie (MRR, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE- Part One of Four by Angela Brickie (MRR, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand Response In Opposition To Motion To Remand filed by Steven Castleberry, Region's Bank. (Malcom, Brian)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Entry of Default Motion is RIPE 11/2/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed Response In Opposition To Motion For Default filed by Steven Castleberry, Region's Bank. (Malcom, Brian)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default Motion is RIPE 11/2/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Angela Brickie. (MRR, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Angela Brickie. (MRR, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint Doc. 1-1 by Steven Castleberry, Region's Bank.(Malcom, Brian)
October 3, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3187620 (B4601092462). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Region's Bank, Steven Castleberry from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number cv18-50., filed by Region's Bank, Steven Castleberry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(MRR, ). (Malcom, Brian) Modified on 10/4/2018 (MRR, ).
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Steven Castleberry, Region's Bank. filed by Steven Castleberry, Region's Bank (Malcom, Brian)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Region's Bank, Steven Castleberry from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number cv18-50., filed by Region's Bank, Steven Castleberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brickie v. Region's Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Region's Bank
Represented By: Brian James Malcom
Represented By: Charles Walton Prueter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Castleberry
Represented By: Brian James Malcom
Represented By: Charles Walton Prueter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Key
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Brickie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?