Tidwell et al v. Department of Veteran Affairs et al
Plaintiff: Drenen Tidwell and Deserea Tidwell
Defendant: MD Tyler P Black and Department of Veteran Affairs
Case Number: 2:2018cv01631
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drenen Tidwell, Deserea Tidwell. Tyler P Black served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Owen, Justin)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drenen Tidwell, Deserea Tidwell. Department of Veteran Affairs served on 10/10/2018, answer due 12/9/2018. (Owen, Justin)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drenen Tidwell, Deserea Tidwell. (Owen, Justin)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drenen Tidwell, Deserea Tidwell. Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III served on 10/9/2018, answer due 12/8/2018. (Owen, Justin)
October 5, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Jay E. Town answer due 12/4/2018. (KEK)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drenen Tidwell, Deserea Tidwell. Jay E. Town served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Owen, Justin)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Tyler P Black, Department of Veteran Affairs. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
October 4, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3189028 (B4601092527). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Tyler P Black, Department of Veteran Affairs, filed by Drenen Tidwell, Deserea Tidwell.(MRR, ). (Owen, Justin) Modified on 10/9/2018 (MRR, ).
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tyler P Black, Department of Veteran Affairs, filed by Drenen Tidwell, Deserea Tidwell.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tidwell et al v. Department of Veteran Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drenen Tidwell
Represented By: Dennis E Goldasich, Jr
Represented By: Justin C Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deserea Tidwell
Represented By: Dennis E Goldasich, Jr
Represented By: Justin C Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Tyler P Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?