Tolgo v. Xtreme Concepts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cody Tolgo
Defendant: Landon Ash, Xtreme Concepts, Inc. and IK9, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01737
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cody Tolgo. Xtreme Concepts, Inc. waiver sent on 11/6/2018, answer due 1/5/2019. (Arnold, Allen)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cody Tolgo. Landon Ash waiver sent on 11/6/2018, answer due 1/5/2019. (Arnold, Allen)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cody Tolgo. IK9, LLC waiver sent on 11/6/2018, answer due 1/5/2019. (Arnold, Allen)
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted (Insufficient Address) as to Landon Ash. (MRR, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted (Insufficient Address) as to Xtreme Concepts, Inc. (MRR, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted (No such street) as to IK9, LLC. (MRR, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Landon Ash, IK9, LLC, Xtreme Concepts, Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
October 22, 2018 Filing Fee received by Allen Arnold in the amount of $400.00, credit card receipt_number 1126-3200760; USDC receipt number B46010912918; related document #1 COMPLAINT against Landon Ash, IK9, LLC, Xtreme Concepts, Inc., filed by Cody Tolgo. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC) (Arnold, Allen) Modified on 10/22/2018 (KWC)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Conflict Disclosure Statement by Cody Tolgo. (JLC)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Cody Tolgo. (JLC)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Landon Ash, IK9, LLC, Xtreme Concepts, Inc., filed by Cody Tolgo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tolgo v. Xtreme Concepts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landon Ash
Represented By: Warren B Lightfoot, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xtreme Concepts, Inc.
Represented By: Warren B Lightfoot, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IK9, LLC
Represented By: Warren B Lightfoot, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Tolgo
Represented By: Allen Durham Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?