Stein v. Energen Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Shiva Stein
Defendant: William G Hargett, Energen Corporation, Vincent J Intrieri, Lori A Lancaster, Frances Powell Hawes, M James Gorrie, Alan A Kleier, James T McManus, II, Jonathan Z Cohen, Jay Grinney and Kenneth W Dewey
Case Number: 2:2018cv01746
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Plaintiff has submitted a notice of voluntary dismissal; Accordingly the defendants have not served either an answer or a motion for summary judgment, it is hereby ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the case be and hereby is DISMISSED with prejudice, costs to be taxed as paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/26/2018. (AFS)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Shiva Stein (Brown, W)
November 2, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400.00, (ALND B4601093191) receipt_number 1126-3210231. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Jonathan Z Cohen, Kenneth W Dewey, Energen Corporation, M James Gorrie, Jay Grinney, William G Hargett, Frances Powell Hawes, Vincent J Intrieri, Alan A Kleier, Lori A Lancaster, James T McManus, II, filed by Shiva Stein.(AFS). (Whatley, Joe) Modified on 11/2/2018 (AFS).
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE regarding consent of a magistrate judge in a civil action.(AFS)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Shiva Stein. (AFS)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jonathan Z Cohen, Kenneth W Dewey, Energen Corporation, M James Gorrie, Jay Grinney, William G Hargett, Frances Powell Hawes, Vincent J Intrieri, Alan A Kleier, Lori A Lancaster, James T McManus, II, filed by Shiva Stein.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stein v. Energen Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G Hargett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent J Intrieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori A Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Powell Hawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M James Gorrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan A Kleier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T McManus, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Z Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Grinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth W Dewey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shiva Stein
Represented By: Joe R Whatley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?