Boler v. American Honda Finance Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Lashunta Boler
Defendant: American Honda Finance Corporation and All-Star Towing Services
Case Number: 2:2018cv01781
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by Lashunta Boler. (Austin-Hatcher, Monica)
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hill, James)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Telephone Conference set for 1/3/2019 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties to call 888-808-6929 and use access code 5917763 to participate; the deadline to consent to a magistrate is extended until 1/7/19; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 12/14/2018. (BST, ) Modified on 12/14/2018 (BST, ).
December 14, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John E Ott: Telephone Conference held on 12/14/2018. (BST, )
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Telephone Conference set for 12/14/2018 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties to call 888-808-6929 and use access code 5917763 to participate; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 12/3/2018. (BST, )
December 3, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John E Ott: Telephone Conference held on 12/3/2018. (BST, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE to remind parties of consent telephone conference scheduled for 11:00 AM on Monday, 12/3/18; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, by 9:00 AM on Monday, 12/3/18, the conference will be cancelled. (BST, )
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Before the undersigned is Defendant American Honda Finance Corporation's #4 partial motion to dismiss. The parties filed a #9 stipulation regarding an extension of time to answer the motion and specifically noted their active settlement negotiations. The court deems this stipulation as a motion to extend the briefing schedule. The motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff SHALL respond to the partial motion to dismiss by December 14, 2018. Any reply by Defendant SHALL be filed by December 21, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 11/16/2018. (SUH)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time by Lashunta Boler. filed by Lashunta Boler (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Austin-Hatcher, Monica)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge after 12/17/2018 unless the unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of undersigned magistrate; Telephone Conference set for 12/3/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties call as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 12/3/2018, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 11/5/2018. (KAM)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 11/5/2018. (BST, )
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Before the undersigned is Defendant American Honda Finance Corporation's #4 partial motion to dismiss. Plaintiff SHALL respond to the motion by November 16, 2018. Any reply by Defendant SHALL be filed by November 30, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 11/05/2018. (SUH)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by American Honda Finance Corporation.(Hill, James)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) by American Honda Finance Corporation. (Hill, James)
October 29, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3206418. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Honda Finance Corporation from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2018-903837.00., filed by American Honda Finance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC). (Hill, James) ALND rec# B4601093099 (KAM, ).
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Honda Finance Corporation. filed by American Honda Finance Corporation (Hill, James)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Consent. (JLC)
October 26, 2018 COMPLAINT against All-Star Towing Services, American Honda Finance Corporation, filed by Lashunta Boler. (Deemed filed 9/23/2018 in the Circuit Court of Jefferson County, attached to the Notice of Removal as Exhibit A).(JLC)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Honda Finance Corporation from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2018-903837.00., filed by American Honda Finance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boler v. American Honda Finance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Finance Corporation
Represented By: C Meade Hartfield
Represented By: James Jackson Hill, IV
Represented By: Keith S Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All-Star Towing Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashunta Boler
Represented By: Monica D Austin-Hatcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?