Lee v. Addiction and Mental Health Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Brenda Lee
Defendant: Addiction and Mental Health Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01816
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Addiction and Mental Health Services, LLC.(Dukes, Carter)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER. Certain deadlines and time limits apply, as set out herein. Discovery due by 8/23/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 9/13/2019; Joint Status Report due by 8/21/2019; Status Conference set for 8/28/2019 at 10:00 AM, eighth floor chambers, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. This case should be ready for trial by March, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 12/12/2018. (FNC)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 12/10/2018. (FNC)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 12/10/2018. (FNC)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Proposed Qualified HIPAA Protective Order)(Dukes, Carter)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Addiction and Mental Health Services, LLC. filed by Addiction and Mental Health Services, LLC (Dukes, Carter)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Addiction and Mental Health Services, LLC.(Dukes, Carter)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brenda Lee. Addiction and Mental Health Services, LLC served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (JLC)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Addiction and Mental Health Services, LLC via certified U.S. Mail on this the 6th day of November, 2018. (Certified Mail Request filed within Complaint). (JLC)
November 2, 2018 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, receipt number B4601093208. (JLC)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Addiction and Mental Health Services, LLC, filed by Brenda Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Addiction and Mental Health Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addiction and Mental Health Services, LLC
Represented By: Joshua S Thompson
Represented By: Carter H Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Lee
Represented By: Susan Nettles Han
Represented By: Brandy Murphy Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?