Bey et al v. Booth et al
Plaintiff: Moorish American People of United States of America Republic and Eric Ingram Bey
Defendant: Mike Booth, Colbert County Sheriff's Department and John H Merrill
Case Number: 2:2018cv01828
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - MAP identifies itself as an Indiana corporation. The Court advises MAP that as a corporation, it cannot proceed pro se. Consequently, if a licensed attorney does not appear for MAP within 30 days, then the Court will dismiss the action. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 12/10/2018. (KEK)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge John E Ott no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 12/4/2018. (KAM)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 11/29/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Eric Ingram Bey. (KAM)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Motion to exempt from all filing and summons fee; USARC is ORDERED to pay the full filing fee by December 20, 2015. Failure to comply will render this action subject to dismissal without further notice; Bey is ORDERED to submit such documentation, or a licensed attorney must file a notice of appearance on behalf of USARC, by December 20, 2018. Failure to comply will also render this action subject to dismissal without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 11/26/2018. (KAM)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for exemption of all fees by Eric Ingram Bey. (KAM)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT ORDER. Plaintiff Eric Bey filed this action on 11/5/2018. The docket sheet indicates, however, that he has neither paid the applicable filing fee nor filed an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP"). See 28 U.S.C. Secs. 1914, 1915. Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the fee or file an IFP application by 12/5/2018. Failure to comply with render this action subject to dismissal without further notice. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order and an IFP application form to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 11/06/2018. (SJB, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mike Booth, Colbert County Sheriff's Department, John H Merrill, filed by Eric Ingram Bey, Moorish American People of United States of America Republic. (deemed filed 10/31/2018 for review)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bey et al v. Booth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colbert County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moorish American People of United States of America Republic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Ingram Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?