Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Live Bait LLC et al

Plaintiff: Pie Eyed Groobee Music, Nashville Star Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp, Carnival Music Company, Concord Music Group Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Woolly Puddin Music, Rondor Music International Inc, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, Beechwood Music Corporation and Universal Music MGB NA LLC
Defendant: Terry Humphryes, Live Bait LLC and Gary Nichols
Case Number: 2:2018cv01852
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Stith Evans on behalf of All Defendants (Evans, Dawn)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rondor Music International Inc, Concord Music Group Inc, Beechwood Music Corporation, Nashville Star Music, Broadcast Music Inc, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Pie Eyed Groobee Music, Woolly Puddin Music, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Stone Diamond Music Corp, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Carnival Music Company, EMI Blackwood Music Inc. All Defendants. (Pewitt, James)
November 9, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3215337. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Terry Humphryes, Live Bait LLC, Gary Nichols, filed by Rondor Music International Inc, Concord Music Group Inc, Beechwood Music Corporation, Nashville Star Music, Broadcast Music Inc, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Pie Eyed Groobee Music, Woolly Puddin Music, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Stone Diamond Music Corp, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Carnival Music Company, EMI Blackwood Music Inc.(KEK). (Pewitt, James) NDAL rec#B4601093443 Modified on 11/14/2018 (KAM, ).
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music Inc, Carnival Music Company, Concord Music Group Inc, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Nashville Star Music, Pie Eyed Groobee Music, Rondor Music International Inc, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Woolly Puddin Music. (KEK)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Terry Humphryes, Live Bait LLC, Gary Nichols, filed by Rondor Music International Inc, Concord Music Group Inc, Beechwood Music Corporation, Nashville Star Music, Broadcast Music Inc, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Pie Eyed Groobee Music, Woolly Puddin Music, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Stone Diamond Music Corp, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Carnival Music Company, EMI Blackwood Music Inc.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Live Bait LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pie Eyed Groobee Music
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nashville Star Music
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone Diamond Music Corp
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carnival Music Company
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord Music Group Inc
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music Inc
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woolly Puddin Music
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International Inc
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs Inc
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Inc
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beechwood Music Corporation
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music MGB NA LLC
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Humphryes
Represented By: Dawn Stith Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Bait LLC
Represented By: Dawn Stith Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Nichols
Represented By: Dawn Stith Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?