Arrowsmith v. Johnson
Appellant: Richard T. Arrowsmith
Appellee: Robert Bradford Johnson
Case Number: 2:2018cv01953
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal of Interlocutory Order by Robert Bradford Johnson. (Hall, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 SECOND AMENDED BRIEFING letter to counsel. (AHI)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED BRIEFING letter to counsel. (AHI)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEFING letter to counsel. (AHI)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD ON APPEAL (Attachments: #1 Designation of Appellant, #2 Designation of Appelle, #3 Adversary Proceeding Docket Sheet, #4 Main Bankruptcy Case Docket Sheet, #5 Order Denying Motion to Modify Stay, #6 Notice of Appeal, #7 Statement of Issues, #8 Transcript of Hearing held on 10-15-2018, #9 Transcript of Hearing of Motion to Dismiss)***CD of Complete Record maintained with file in Clerk's Office***(AHI)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Richard T. Arrowsmith re #3 Notice (Other) Notice of Withdrawal of Liquidating Trustee's Statement of Issues to be Presented on Appeal (Sparks, Daniel)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Richard T. Arrowsmith Liquidating Trustee's Statement of Issues to be Presented on Appeal (Sparks, Daniel)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE - The Bankruptcy Clerk of Court has promptly transmitted a Notice of Appeal to this Court pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8003(d)(1). The court reminds the parties of the requirements of Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. Parties must file with the Bankruptcy Court their designations, transcript(s) and a statement of the issues to complete the record on appeal. When the record on appeal is complete, the Bankruptcy Clerk of Court will transmit the record to this Courts Clerk of Court. The Court will set a briefing schedule following the Bankruptcy Clerk of Court's notice of transmitting the record. At the direction of the court, the parties are directed to comply with the provisions Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. (AHI)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-02395-TOM-11. File received, filed by Richard T. Arrowsmith. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Order Denying Motion to Modify Stay, #3 Main Bankruptcy Case Docket Sheet, #4 AP 18-230 Docket Sheet)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrowsmith v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Richard T. Arrowsmith
Represented By: Bradley R Hightower
Represented By: Daniel D Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Robert Bradford Johnson
Represented By: Marc P Solomon
Represented By: Michael L Hall
Represented By: Anna Whitney Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?