Federal National Mortgage Association v. McGraw
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: Diadra Nicole McGraw
Case Number: 2:2018cv01961
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Diadra Nicole McGraw served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (KEK)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Diadra Nicole McGraw. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 12/3/2018. (KEK)
November 29, 2018 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3227416, NDAL receipt #B4601093755. (Reeves, T) Modified on 11/30/2018 (JLC).
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Reeves, T)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diadra Nicole McGraw, filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association v. McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diadra Nicole McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Jessica Brookshire Spade
Represented By: Christopher A Bottcher
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?