Sumerlin v. United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Samuel Sumerlin
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 2:2018cv01975
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 42:1396
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE Case reassigned to Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to case. Please use case number 2:18-cv-1975-MHH for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 1/15/2019. (AFS)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Samuel Sumerlin (AFS)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE the MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #7 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing by January 28, 2019 why the court has jurisdiction over this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/27/2018. (AFS)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Samuel Sumerlin. (JLC)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING Plaintiff must fully complete a single IFP application within 30 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/14/2018. (AFS)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 12/7/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Samuel Sumerlin. (JLC)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING Plaintiff must clearly indicate his monthly expenses or obligations on the attached form, indicate where and when he last worked, include any key factors he says support his inability to pay the filing fee. Plaintiff must correct this deficiency within 30 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/30/2018. (AFS)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action.(AFS)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 11/29/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Samuel Sumerlin. (AFS)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Postal Service, filed by Samuel Sumerlin.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sumerlin v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Sumerlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?