Federal National Mortgage Association v. McGraw et al
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: Diadra N McGraw and Michael DeGraw
Counter Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc and Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01976
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Diadra N McGraw. (Hood, Rhonda)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Ms. McGraw's reply in support of her motion to remand is due on or before January 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/23/2019. (KMG)
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time by Michael DeGraw, Diadra N McGraw. (Hood, Rhonda)
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Reeves, T)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Stay. The court STAYS these proceedings pending a ruling on Ms. McGraw's motion to remand (Doc. 10). Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., and Ocwen Loan Servicing shall respond to Ms. McGraw's motion to remand (Doc. 10) on or before January 16, 2019. Ms. McGraw shall file a reply on or before January 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/2/2019. (KMG)
January 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay by Diadra N McGraw. (Hood, Rhonda)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Diadra N McGraw. (Hood, Rhonda)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC (Reeves, T)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC (Reeves, T)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Annemarie Carney Axon. Please use case number 2:18-cv-1976-ACA on all subsequent pleadings. The status conference set for December 20, 2018 is CANCELLED. (MRR, )
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by the magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than January 13, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after January 13, 2019. A status conference with the magistrate judge is hereby SET for 10:00 AM on Thursday, December 20, 2018, in chambers of the undersigned. The conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted at least twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 12/3/2018. (KEK)
December 3, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3229943 (ALND B4601093857) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 2014-902355., filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 part 1, # 4 Exhibit 3 part 2)(KAM, ). (Reeves, T) Modified on 12/4/2018 (KEK).
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Reeves, T)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Escrow Funds by Federal National Mortgage Association, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Reeves, T)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Evidentiary Material re: #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit 4. (Reeves, T)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 2014-902355., filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 part 1, #4 Exhibit 3 part 2)(KAM, )
November 29, 2018 ANSWER to Complaint and Counterclaim against Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc and Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC by Diadra N McGraw. (deemed filed 1/26/2015 in State Court)(KAM)
November 29, 2018 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint and Counterclaim against Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc and Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC by Diadra N McGraw.(deemed filed on 9/13/2018 in state court)(KAM)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER dismissing complaint without prejudice; Defendant's Counterclaims remain pending as to all Counterclaim Defendants (deemed filed on 10/31/2018 by Judge Joseph L. Boohaker in state court) (KAM)
November 29, 2018 MOTION to realign parties by Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (deemed filed 11/28/2018 in state court) (KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association v. McGraw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Represented By: Jessica Brookshire Spade
Represented By: Christopher A Bottcher
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Jessica Brookshire Spade
Represented By: Christopher A Bottcher
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: William S McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diadra N McGraw
Represented By: Rhonda Steadman Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael DeGraw
Represented By: Rhonda Steadman Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?