Southern Visions, LLP v. Red Diamond, Inc.
Plaintiff: Southern Visions, LLP
Defendant: Red Diamond Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv02039
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/11/2018. (AFS)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 1/4/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 1/4/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:15 a.m. on 12/28/2018. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/11/2018. (AFS)
December 11, 2018 Filing 58 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-04566. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 11, 2018 Filing 57 AO Form 120 forwarded to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
December 10, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Doc. #9 ]; GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Defendant's "Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama" [Doc. #13 ]. Specifically, the Court denies Defendant's motion to dismiss, grants Defendant's motion to transfer, and TRANSFERS this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Additionally, the Court DENIES Defendant's Motion to Strike [Doc. #50 ]; DENIES AS MOOT Defendant's "Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to [Plaintiff's] Motion for Preliminary Injunction" [Doc. #40 ]; DENIES AS MOOT Defendant's "Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction Proceedings until Venue is Resolved" [Doc. #14 ]; and GRANTS Plaintiff's motions to file matters under seal [Docs. #11 , #39 , #54 ]. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/10/2018. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE Of Filing by Red Diamond, Inc. Slides Used During November 30 Hearing (Attachments: #1 Alan Rogers Slides, #2 Harlan Prater Slides)(South, Clinton) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #53 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Southern Visions, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crain, Norman) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 53 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit B that was Submitted During the November 30, 2018 Hearing Under Seal by Southern Visions, LLP re #52 Notice of Filing, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - UNREDACTED Version of Southern Visions, LLP's PowerPoint Slide Deck with Arguments on Preliminary Injunction Motion)(Crain, Norman) Modified on 12/11/2018 to remove "provisionally" per #56 Order. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE Of Filing Documents Submitted and Requested During the November 30, 2018 Hearing by Southern Visions, LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Southern Visions, LLP's PowerPoint Slide Deck with Arguments on Venue Motion, #2 Exhibit B - REDACTED Version of Southern Visions, LLP's PowerPoint Slide Deck with Arguments on Preliminary Injunction Motion, #3 Exhibit C - Compliance Test Sieve Certifications)(Crain, Norman) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eleanor L. Ross: Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2018 re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Southern Visions, LLP. Also present during the hearing were Dr. Steve Hicks, Sandy Lamb, Paul Stewart and Adam Stewart with Southern Visions, LLP and Sam McCallister and Bill Bowron with Red Diamond, Inc. Court called to order. The parties introduced themselves. Defendant's counsel addressed the Court and the venue motion. Plaintiff's counsel addressed the Court and the preliminary injunction motion. The parties provided arguments. The Court will prepare an order memorializing its rulings. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Jana Colter)(cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION to Strike Evidence Offered in Support of Plaintiff's #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Red Diamond, Inc. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 29, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorneys Elizabeth Jones Flachsbart and Michael P. Taunton as to Red Diamond, Inc. regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #41 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Elizabeth Jones Flachsbart and GRANTING #42 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Michael P. Taunton. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/29/18. (mlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 11/30/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/28/2018. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 28, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #42 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael P. Taunton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8277388). Attorney Michael P. Taunton added appearing on behalf of Red Diamond, Inc. (cdg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 28, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #41 APPLICATION for Admission of Elizabeth Jones Flachsbart Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8277332). Attorney Elizabeth Jones Flachsbart added appearing on behalf of Red Diamond, Inc. (cdg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 48 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(South, Clinton) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on 11/30/2018. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/27/2018. (rjs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Southern Visions' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Southern Visions, LLP. (Crain, Norman) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 45 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Southern Visions, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crain, Norman) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Dan Robert Gresham on behalf of Southern Visions, LLP (Gresham, Dan) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE by Red Diamond, Inc. re #32 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Consideration, #40 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Southern Visions' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #37 Reply to Response to Motion, #38 Notice of Filing, #10 Notice of Filing, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Prosecution history of '222 patent, #2 Exhibit Prosecution history of '232 patent, #3 Exhibit Prosecution history of '852 patent)(South, Clinton) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 19, 2018 Submission of #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venueor, in the Alternative MOTION to Transfer Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 42 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael P. Taunton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8277388)by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 41 APPLICATION for Admission of Elizabeth Jones Flachsbart Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8277332)by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Southern Visions' #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Red Diamond Sur-Reply, #2 Ex. B - Stewart Decl ('222 Pat), #3 Ex. C - Examiner Interview Summary, #4 Ex. D - '222 Pat Notice of Allowance, #5 Ex. E - Stewart Decl ('232 Pat), #6 Ex. F - Stewart Decl ('852 Pat), #7 Ex. G - Response to Office Action, #8 Ex. H - '232 Pat Notice of Allowance, #9 Ex. I - '852 Pat Notice of Allowance)(South, Clinton) Modified on 11/16/2018 to edit text and add document link (rlb). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 15, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorney James MacDonald Robertson as to Red Diamond, Inc. regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #33 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by James MacDonald Robertson and GRANTING #34 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Harlan Irby Prater, IV.. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/15/18. (mlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 14, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #34 APPLICATION for Admission of Harlan I Prater, IV Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Harlan Irby Prater, IV added appearing on behalf of Red Diamond, Inc. (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 14, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #33 APPLICATION for Admission of James MacDonald Robertson Pro Hac Vice. Attorney James MacDonald Robertson added appearing on behalf of Red Diamond, Inc. (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #38 Notice of Filing with Brief In Support by Southern Visions, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crain, Norman) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 38 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of Its #9 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Southern Visions, LLP re #37 Reply to Response to Motion, (Crain, Norman) Modified on 11/13/2018 to edit text and create document link (rlb). Modified on 12/11/2018 to remove "provisionally" per #56 Order. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION to Expedite Consideration filed by Southern Visions, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Office Action, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Allowance)(Crain, Norman) Modified on 11/13/2018 to edit text (rlb). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Alabama (within the #35 Reply Brief). by Red Diamond, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Declaration of Thomas A. Ruszkowski, #2 Exhibit B - Verint Br. in Support of Mot. to Trans. and Supp. Dec.)(rlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 35 REPLY BRIEF re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Declaration of Thomas A. Ruszkowski, #2 Exhibit B - Verint Br. in Support of Mot. to Trans. and Supp. Dec.)(Archer, T.) Modified on 11/8/2018 to edit text (rlb). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 34 APPLICATION for Admission of Harlan I Prater, IV Pro Hac Vice by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 33 APPLICATION for Admission of James MacDonald Robertson Pro Hac Vice by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 5, 2018 Submission of #14 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction Proceedings Until Venue is Resolved, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Consideration filed by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Ruszkowski Decl, #2 Appendix B - Stewart Decl 9_13_16, #3 Appendix C - 222 pat allowance, #4 Appendix D - Stewart Decl 2_4_16, #5 Appendix E - Aita Report and CV, #6 Appendix F - USPTO Interview Summary, #7 Appendix G - Moses Letter, #8 Appendix H - Goggi Part 1, #9 Appendix H - Goggi Part 2, #10 Appendix H - Goggi Part 3, #11 Appendix H - Goggi Part 4, #12 Appendix I - AU Patent, #13 Appendix J - McLeod Decl)(South, Clinton) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
November 1, 2018 Submission of #11 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #10 Notice of Filing to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative MOTION to Transfer Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama filed by Southern Visions, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Adam Stewart, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Michael L. Marable, #3 Exhibit A - Georgia Secretary of State Filing, #4 Exhibit B - Property Tax Information, #5 Exhibit C - Flight Schedules)(Crain, Norman) Modified on 10/31/2018 to edit text. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #29 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant to file its Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Doc. #9 ] is extended through and including November 2, 2018 and the deadline for Plaintiff to file its Reply Brief is extended through and including November 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/30/2018. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Defendant to File Response re: #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Consideration by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Archer, T.) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING #24 Emergency Motion to Vacate Order. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/29/2018. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 Emergency MOTION to Vacate #12 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, filed by Red Diamond, Inc.. (South, Clinton) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 Emergency MOTION to Vacate #12 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, filed by Southern Visions, LLP. (Crain, Norman) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 25, 2018 Submission of #24 Emergency MOTION to Vacate #12 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, #25 Proposed Order to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER re: #24 Emergency MOTION to Vacate #12 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, . (Archer, T.) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 24, 2018 Clerks Notation re #23 Leave of Absence. Attorney Norman Andrew Crain is relieved from personally having to attend any proceedings or trials in this matter on the following dates: December 3-7, 2018; January 2-4, 2019 and February 4-8, 2019. This leave of absence will not affect the processing of this case including the scheduling of motions, hearings, trials or other events before this Court. (mlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 24 Emergency MOTION to Vacate #12 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 23 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): December 3, 2018 - December 7, 2018, January 2, 2019 - January 4, 2019, February 4, 2019 - February 8, 2019, by Norman Andrew Crain. (Crain, Norman) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 24, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorneys Alan Taylor Rogers and Marcus R. Chatterton as to Red Diamond, Inc. regarding [15, 16] Order on Application for Admission PHV. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (mlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Alan Taylor Rogers and GRANTING #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Marcus R. Chatterton. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/24/18. (mlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Ray South on behalf of Red Diamond, Inc. (South, Clinton) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF re #14 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction Proceedings Until Venue is Resolved filed by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas Ruszkowski)(Archer, T.) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 23, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Marcus R. Chatterton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8213967). Attorney Marcus R. Chatterton added appearing on behalf of Red Diamond, Inc. (pmb)[Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 23, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Alan Taylor Rogers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8213949). Attorney Alan Taylor Rogers added appearing on behalf of Red Diamond, Inc. (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 23, 2018 RETURN of #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Jim M. Robertson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8214000) to attorney for correction re: name. (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 23, 2018 RETURN of #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Harlan I Prater, IV Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8213975) to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction Proceedings Until Venue is Resolved filed by Southern Visions, LLP. (Crain, Norman) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #12 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, filed by Southern Visions, LLP (Crain, Norman) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Jim M. Robertson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8214000)by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Harlan I Prater, IV Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8213975)by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Marcus R. Chatterton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8213967)by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Alan Taylor Rogers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8213949)by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction Proceedings Until Venue is Resolved by Red Diamond, Inc.. (Archer, T.) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama by Red Diamond, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Thomas A. Ruszkowski, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Robert Feyerabend)(Archer, T.) . Added MOTION to Transfer Case and edited text on 10/18/2018. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Ruled on by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/17/2018 within the #12 Order. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2018 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1708 before Judge Eleanor L. Ross. If Defendant intends to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Defendant must file a response within fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this order. Plaintiff will then have seven (7) days to file a reply brief. The Court DIRECTS counsel for Plaintiff to serve a copy of this order on Defendant and, if known, Defendant's counsel. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/17/2018. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 15, 2018 NEF regenerated RE: #10 Notice of Filing. (aaq) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 15, 2018 Submission of #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION to Expedite Consideration to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #10 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Southern Visions, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crain, Norman) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Southern Visions, LLP re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Expedited Consideration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Adam Stewart, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Sandy Lamb)(Crain, Norman) Modified on 10/15/2018 to edit text. (cmd) Modified on 12/11/2018 to remove "provisionally" per #56 Order. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Expedited Consideration with Brief In Support by Southern Visions, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Consideration (Redacted), #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Adam Stewart (Redacted), #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Sandy Lamb (Redacted), #4 Exhibit C - '222 Patent, #5 Exhibit D - '330 Patent, #6 Exhibit E - '634 Patent, #7 Exhibit F - '232 Patent, #8 Exhibit G - '852 Patent)(Crain, Norman) . Added MOTION to Expedite and edited text on 10/15/2018. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Southern Visions, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crain, Norman) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Southern Visions, LLP. Red Diamond, Inc. served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Crain, Norman) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 AO Form 120 forwarded to Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 2, 2018 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Southern Visions, LLP. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Southern Visions, LLP. (Crain, Norman) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Crain, Norman) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
October 2, 2018 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Red Diamond, Inc. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Southern Visions, LLP. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8178455) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- '222 Patent, #2 Exhibit B- Claim Chart for the '222 Patent, #3 Exhibit C- '330 Patent, #4 Exhibit D- Claim Chart for the '330 Patent, #5 Exhibit E- '634 Patent, #6 Exhibit F- Claim Chart for the '634 Patent, #7 Exhibit G- '232 Patent, #8 Exhibit H- Claim Chart for the '232 Patent, #9 Exhibit I- '852 Patent, #10 Exhibit J- Claim Chart for the '852 Patent, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Visions, LLP v. Red Diamond, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Diamond Inc
Represented By: James MacDonald Robertson
Represented By: Elizabeth Jones Flachsbart
Represented By: Michael Paul Taunton
Represented By: Clinton Ray South
Represented By: Marcus R Chatterton
Represented By: Alan T Rogers
Represented By: T. Joshua Archer
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Visions, LLP
Represented By: Wesley Austin Roberts
Represented By: Dan R Gresham
Represented By: N Andrew Crain
Represented By: Matthew H Lembke
Represented By: Joel M Kuehnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?