United States of America v. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Currency
Claimant: Gary H. Smart
Case Number: 2:2018cv02125
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER A Telephone Conference is SET for May 31, 2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. The parties are directed to join the conference by dialing 888-636-3807 and entering access code 3676046. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on February 14, 2019. (TNC)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay. The matter is STAYED pending the outcome of the claimant's state court criminal proceeding. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on February 14, 2019.(TNC)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay by Gary H. Smart. (Marshall, Hope)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 CLAIM Verified Claim of Interest in Seized Property by Gary H. Smart. (Marshall, Hope)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture to G.S., c/o Hope S. Marshall, Esq. (Borton, Thomas)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 Warrant For Arrest and Notice (MRR, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Currency($36.06 in United States currency formerly located in Avadian Credit Union Account #XX6070 (Share 03)), Currency($5 in United States currency formerly located in Avadian Credit Union Account #XX6070 (Share 01)), Currency($2.51 in United States currency formerly located in Avaidan Credit Union Account #XX6070 (Share 30)), Currency($11,291.72 in United States currency formerly located in Avadian Credit Union Account #XXX0772(Share 02)), filed by United States of America.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas E Borton, IV
Represented By: Jay E Town
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gary H. Smart
Represented By: Hope S Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?