Regions Equipment Finance Corporation v. PHI Inc
Plaintiff: Regions Equipment Finance Corporation
Defendant: PHI Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00026
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 3/4/2019. (BST, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Regions Equipment Finance Corporation, PHI Inc. (BST, )
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER. #6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Original Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction is deemed MOOT based upon Plaintiff's filing of #11 the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 2/27/2019. (SJB)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PHI Inc, filed by Regions Equipment Finance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Davis, Anna)
February 20, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 3/5/2019 Replies due by 3/12/2019. (KAM)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT SUBMISSION ORDER re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, filed by Defendant PHI, Inc. Plaintiff shall file any opposition or other response to the motion to dismiss by March 5, 2019; Defendant may file a reply by March 12, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 2/19/2019. (SJB)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge after 3/22/2019 unless they unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of the undersigned magistrate; Telephone Conference set for 3/7/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties to call as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 3/7/2019, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 2/8/2019. (KAM)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 2/8/2019. (BST, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHI Inc. filed by PHI Inc (Morris, Brenton)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by PHI Inc. (Morris, Brenton)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regions Equipment Finance Corporation. PHI Inc served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Davis, Anna)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Regions Equipment Finance Corporation re #1 Complaint Exhibit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Davis, Anna)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to PHI Inc delivered to plaintiff for service (KAM)
January 10, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3252708. related document #1 COMPLAINT against PHI Inc, filed by Regions Equipment Finance Corporation.(KAM). (Davis, Anna)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Regions Equipment Finance Corporation (KAM)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHI Inc, filed by Regions Equipment Finance Corporation.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regions Equipment Finance Corporation v. PHI Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regions Equipment Finance Corporation
Represented By: Anna R Davis
Represented By: Stephen A Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHI Inc
Represented By: Brenton K Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?