Little v. Gordy et al

Defendant: Chris Gordy and Attorney General of the State of ALabama
Petitioner: Dennis Little
Case Number: 2:2019cv00028
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
0 Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
1 Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Motion of Respondents treating Response #6 as a motion for summary judgment pursuant to Order #7 .(KEK)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - This is a habeas corpus case filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 by the petitioner, an Alabama prisoner proceeding pro se. After the undersigned issued an order to show cause (Doc. #4 ), the respondents filed an answer and exhibits in response, asserting habeas relief is due to be denied (Doc. #6 ). The undersigned deems the case ripe for summary disposition under Rule 8(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases on the basis of the defenses asserted in the respondents answer. The petitioner shall have twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order to supply any additional evidentiary materials or legal arguments he may wish to offer with regard to whether the petition is subject to summary disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/26/2019. (KEK)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Attorney General of the State of ALabama, Chris Gordy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B1 - Part 1, #3 Exhibit B1 - Part 2, #4 Exhibit B2 - Part 1, #5 Exhibit B2 - Part 2, #6 Exhibit B3 - Part 1, #7 Exhibit B3 - Part 2, #8 Exhibit B4, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit F)(Wilkerson, Kristi)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi O Wilkerson on behalf of Attorney General of the State of ALabama, Chris Gordy (Wilkerson, Kristi)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Petitioner, an Alabama inmate presently confined at Donaldson Correctional Facility, has filed a petition for habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. (Doc. #1 ). He has been granted permission to proceed in forma pauperis. (Doc. #3 ). Respondents are ORDERED to appear and SHOW CAUSE in writing, within twenty-one (21) calendar days from the entry date of this order, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/4/2019. (KEK)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/10/2019. (TLM, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dennis Little. (TLM, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.), filed by Dennis Little.(TLM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little v. Gordy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Gordy
Represented By: Kristi O Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the State of ALabama
Represented By: Kristi O Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dennis Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?