Payne v. Schreiber LLC

Plaintiff: Jerry Wade Payne
Defendant: Schreiber LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00033
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
0 Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
1 Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:12117ad
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Annemarie Carney Axon. Please use case number 2:19-33-ACA on all subsequent pleadings. Case Reassigned to Judge Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Schreiber LLC.(Hargrove, John)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schreiber LLC. filed by Schreiber LLC (Hargrove, John)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Schreiber LLC., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
January 8, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3250719 (B4601094588). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Schreiber LLC, filed by Jerry Wade Payne. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(MRR, ). (Haynes, Kenneth) Modified on 1/9/2019 (MRR, ).
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
January 8, 2019 Request for service by certified mail within the body of the complaint filed by Jerry Wade Payne. (MRR, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Schreiber LLC, filed by Jerry Wade Payne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Schreiber LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Wade Payne
Represented By: Kenneth D Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schreiber LLC
Represented By: John W Hargrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?