Greer et al v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, The et al

Plaintiff: Suzanna F Greer and Estate of Lisa Eidson Greer, The
Defendant: Guideone Mutual Insurance Company and Cincinnati Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 2:2019cv00060
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. (Burgess, James) Modified docket text on 3/6/2019 (MRR, ).
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 3/4/2019. (PMA)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The.(Burgess, James)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER re #6 Order setting conference. The conference is CANCELLED, the parties having consented to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 2/15/2019. (PMA)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to re #4 GuideOne Mutual Insurance Company's Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief filed by Estate of Lisa Eidson Greer, The, Suzanna F Greer. (Roberts, James)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than February 24, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after February 24, 2019. A status conference is hereby SET for 2:30 pm on February 19, 2019, in chambers. The conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 2/1/19. (MRR, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Guideone Mutual Insurance Company. filed by Guideone Mutual Insurance Company (Pearce, Julie)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM by Guideone Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibt A)(Pearce, Julie) Modified docket text on 1/30/2019 (MRR, ).
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction(MRR, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Davis Pearce on behalf of Guideone Mutual Insurance Company (Pearce, Julie)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Guideone Mutual Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, The from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2018-904789., filed by Guideone Mutual Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greer et al v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guideone Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Julie Davis Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company, The
Represented By: James Thomas Burgess
Represented By: James Kerry Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanna F Greer
Represented By: James S Roberts, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Lisa Eidson Greer, The
Represented By: James S Roberts, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?