Hammell v. Gordy et al

Petitioner: Harrell Hammell
Respondent: Christopher Gordy and Attorney General of the State of Alabama
Case Number: 2:2019cv00062
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Respondents' ANSWER to Complaint by Attorney General of the State of Alabama, Christopher Gordy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Starrett, Marc)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Starrett on behalf of Attorney General of the State of Alabama, Christopher Gordy (Starrett, Marc)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Respondents are ORDERED to appear and SHOW CAUSE in writing, within twenty (20) calendar days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 1/15/2019. (KEK)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number ALND H4601003867), filed by Harrell Hammell.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammell v. Gordy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harrell Hammell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher Gordy
Represented By: Marc Starrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Alabama
Represented By: Marc Starrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?