Reese v. Lowes Home Improvement Center

Plaintiff: Elizabeth C Reese
Defendant: Lowes Home Improvement Center
Case Number: 2:2019cv00068
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this action will be reassigned to a district judge after 4/1/2019 unless the unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of the undersigned magistrate; Telephone Conference set for 3/18/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties to call as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 3/18/2019, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 2/21/2019. (KAM)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 2/20/2019. (BST, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Knox Averitt on behalf of Lowes Home Improvement Center (Averitt, Anne)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowes Home Improvement Center. filed by Lowes Home Improvement Center (Stewart, Charles)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lowes Home Improvement Center.(Stewart, Charles)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Lowes Home Improvement Center served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (KWC)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Lowes Home Improvement Center mailed certified mail (KAM)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 Request for service by certified mail filed by Elizabeth C Reese. (Gilchrist-Davis, Charity)
January 18, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, receipt number B4601094856. (JLC)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER denying #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's affidavit shows she has been and continues to be regularly and gainfully employed at Home Depot, that she has earned approximately $29,150 in the past 12 months, and that she has approximately $3000 in a bank account. The court finds that such supports that Plaintiff is financially able to pay the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 1/15/2019. (SJB)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 1/14/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Elizabeth C Reese. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Gilchrist-Davis, Charity)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lowes Home Improvement Center, filed by Elizabeth C Reese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese v. Lowes Home Improvement Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth C Reese
Represented By: Charity Gilchrist-Davis
Represented By: Lee David Winston
Represented By: Roderick T Cooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Home Improvement Center
Represented By: Charles A Stewart, III
Represented By: Anne Knox Averitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?