Musachia v. Pernix Therapeutics LLC
Plaintiff: Jack Musachia
Defendant: Pernix Therapeutics LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00097
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Pernix Therapeutics, LLC by Pernix Therapeutics LLC. filed by Pernix Therapeutics LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bankruptcy Petition)(Schach, Patrick)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Musachia. Pernix Therapeutics LLC served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (JLC)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pernix Therapeutics LLC via certified U.S. Mail on this the 1st day of February, 2019. (JLC)
January 31, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Jack Musachia. (Winston, Lee)
January 24, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3263212, NDAL receipt #B4601094937. (Winston, Lee) Modified on 1/25/2019 (JLC).
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pernix Therapeutics, LLC, filed by Jack Musachia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Musachia v. Pernix Therapeutics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pernix Therapeutics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Musachia
Represented By: Lee David Winston
Represented By: Roderick T Cooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?