Allison et al v. Birmingham, City of, The

Plaintiff: Michael Allison and Adam McConnell
Defendant: Birmingham, City of, The
Case Number: 2:2019cv00244
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER- The deft has filed a motion to dismiss the amended complaint (Doc #9 ); It is ORDERED that the pltfs shall file a response to the motion within fourteen (14) calendar days; The response shall be limited to fifteen (15) pages, exclusive of exhibits; The deft shall file any reply within seven (7) calendar days thereafter; The reply shall be limited to ten (10) pages, exclusive of exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/29/19. (MRR, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Birmingham, City of, The. (Chandler, Samantha)
March 13, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Status Conference held on 3/13/2019; atty Joseph Abrams present; conf adj. (chambers) (MSN)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The plaintiffs have filed an amended complaint. (Doc. #7 ). In light of the amended complaint, the defendant's motion to dismiss (Doc. #3 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE because it is directed at what is no longer the operative complaint. The defendant may renew any applicable arguments in response to the amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/13/2019. (KEK)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Adam McConnell, Michael Allison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit eeoc charge and RTS)(Bennitt, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is currently set for 10:30 a.m. on March 13, 2019. (Doc. #5 ). The parties are REMINDED that the status conference will be cancelled by separate order if, prior to the date of the conference, all parties submit forms indicating whether they consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/11/2019. (MSN)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than April 8, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after April 8, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 am on March 13, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/25/19. (MRR, )
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER- The deft filed a motion to dismiss (Doc #3 ); It is ORDERED that the pltfs shall file a response within fourteen (14) calendar days; The response shall be limited to fifteen (15) pages, exclusive of exhibits; The deft shall file any reply within seven (7) calendar days thereafter; The reply shall be limited to ten (10) pages, exclusive of exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/25/19. (MRR, ) Modified text on 2/25/2019 (MRR, ).
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Birmingham, City of, The. (Chandler, Samantha)
February 15, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601095473 (MRR, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Birmingham, City of, The from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2018-903006., filed by Birmingham, City of, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allison et al v. Birmingham, City of, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Allison
Represented By: Terrell E McCants
Represented By: Jeffrey W Bennitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam McConnell
Represented By: Terrell E McCants
Represented By: Jeffrey W Bennitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birmingham, City of, The
Represented By: Samantha A Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?