Ramsey v. Infinity Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Mary Ramsey
Defendant: Infinity Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00258
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12117ad
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended against Infinity Insurance Company, filed by Mary Ramsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(Long, Felicia)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The plaintiff has filed a motion to seal the exhibits attached to her complaint on the ground certain information should have been redacted from those exhibits before they were filed. (Doc. #4 ). The motion is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to SEAL the exhibits attached to the complaint. The plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint with the redacted exhibits attached on or before March 1, 2019. The plaintiff is FURTHER DIRECTED to serve on the defendant both the original complaint with the unredacted exhibits attached and the amended complaint with the redacted exhibits attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/22/19. (MRR, )
February 19, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601095480 (MRR, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint Exhibits A & B by Mary Ramsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A & B)(Fonteneau, Kira)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Mary Ramsey (MRR, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Infinity Insurance Company, filed by Mary Ramsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MRR, ) Modified- Sealed exhibits pursuant to Order, Doc 5 on 2/22/2019 (MRR, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramsey v. Infinity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ramsey
Represented By: Kira Y Fonteneau
Represented By: Felicia Teanna Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?