Davidson v. CHSPSC LLC
Plaintiff: Jayme Davidson
Defendant: CHSPSC LLC, Affinity Hospital LLC, CHSPSC LLC doing business as Grandview Medical Center and Affinity Hospital LLC doing business as Grandview Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2019cv00263
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12117ad
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: certain time limits apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 12/6/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/6/2020. Pretrial conference ready in June 2020; Mediation in December 2019; Jury Trial ready in July 2020. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/13/2019. (KAM)
August 13, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Scheduling Conference held on 8/13/2019. A separate Scheduling Order will be entered by the court. (KLL)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2019 10:00 AM before Judge R David Proctor.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/7/2019. (KAM)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/30/2019. (KAM)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/30/2019. (KAM)
May 30, 2019 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rodgers, John)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/13/2019. (KAM)
May 8, 2019 Filing 17 The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge, this case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Judge R David Proctor. Magistrate Judge John E Ott no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that the telephone conference that was set for today at 11:00 a.m. is cancelled; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 5/8/2019. (BST, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE to remind parties of consent telephone conference scheduled for 11:00 AM on Wednesday, 5/8/19; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, by 9:00 AM on Wednesday, 5/8/19, the conference will be cancelled. (BST)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge after 5/28/2019 unless they unanimously consent to the dispositive jurisdiction of the undersigned magistrate judge; Telephone Conference set for 5/8/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties call as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 5/8/2019, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 4/15/2019. (KAM)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 4/15/2019. (BST, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Affinity Hospital LLC. filed by Affinity Hospital LLC (Mataya, Charles)
April 10, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Affinity Hospital LLC.(Mataya, Charles)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 unopposed motion for extension of time to answer.Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 04/01/2019. (SUH)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 3/27/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Affinity Hospital LLC. (Mataya, Charles)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 motion for admission of J. Rodgers pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 03/13/2019.(SUH)
March 12, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3299107 (ALND B4601096040). (Mataya, Charles) Modified on 3/13/2019 (KEK).
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission of J Rodgers Pro Hac Vice by Affinity Hospital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of John Rodgers)(Mataya, Charles)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 joint motion to change the name of the defendant as set out in the joint stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 03/08/2019. (SUH)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J Mataya on behalf of CHSPSC LLC (Mataya, Charles)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION Stipulation to Change Name of Defendant by CHSPSC LLC. (Mataya, Charles)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jayme Davidson. CHSPSC LLC served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (KAM)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CHSPSC LLC d/b/a Grandview Medical Center mailed certified mail. (KAM)
February 15, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3280832, NDAL receipt #B4601095477. (Han, Susan) Modified on 2/15/2019 (JLC).
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHSPSC LLC, filed by Jayme Davidson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson v. CHSPSC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayme Davidson
Represented By: Susan Nettles Han
Represented By: Brandy Murphy Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHSPSC LLC
Represented By: Charles J Mataya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinity Hospital LLC
Represented By: Charles J Mataya
Represented By: John P Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHSPSC LLC doing business as Grandview Medical Center
Represented By: Charles J Mataya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinity Hospital LLC doing business as Grandview Medical Center
Represented By: Charles J Mataya
Represented By: John P Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?