Turner et al v. Wells Fargo NA et al
Plaintiff: Trenton O Turner, Jr and Donna L Turner
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services LLC and Wells Fargo NA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00274
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Incorporated Brief in Support Thereof by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Wells Fargo NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Robinson, James) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (AFS).
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Trenton O Turner, Jr, Donna L Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit notice of intent to foreclose, #2 Exhibit foreclosure notice)(Lay, Kenneth)
March 14, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Robinson, James)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Extension of Time; granting #12 MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint; Amended Complaint is due on 3/29/2019; MOTION to Dismiss and Strike Complaint #5 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refile in the event Plaintiffs' amended complaint does not cure the deficiencies outlined in the Defendants' motion. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 3/8/2019. (AFS)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint by Donna L Turner, Trenton O Turner, Jr. (Lay, Kenneth)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss in Part and Strike in Part Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Donna L Turner, Trenton O Turner, Jr. (Lay, Kenneth)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss in Part and Strike in Part Plaintiffs' Complaint by Donna L Turner, Trenton O Turner, Jr. (Lay, Kenneth)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge Abdul K Kallon. Magistrate Judge John H England, III no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:19-cv-00274-AKK for all subsequent pleadings. The status conference scheduled for 3/15/2019 is CANCELLED. (AFS)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 2/15/2019. (AFS)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 4/1/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 4/1/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 a.m. on March 15, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 2/15/2019. (AFS)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline for #5 Motion to Dismiss. Any opposition to the motion must be filed by February 28, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 02/14/2019. (CLS2)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss in Part and Strike in Part Plaintiffs' Complaint by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Wells Fargo NA. (Robinson, James)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo NA. filed by Wells Fargo NA (Robinson, James)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC. filed by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC (Robinson, James)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Wells Fargo NA from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2019-900212, filed by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Wells Fargo NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KEK)
February 14, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400.00, (ALND B4601095448) receipt_number 1126-3279522. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Wells Fargo NA from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2019-900212, filed by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Wells Fargo NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(KEK). (Robinson, James) Modified on 2/15/2019 (AFS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner et al v. Wells Fargo NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trenton O Turner, Jr
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna L Turner
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services LLC
Represented By: James Hunter Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo NA
Represented By: James Hunter Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?