Reid et al v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP

Plaintiff: Diane Reid and Cecil Reid
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv00286
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/22/2019. (KAM)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order HIPAA Protective Order)(Sydnor, Marda)
March 4, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3292534. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East LP from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2018-904575, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KEK). (Sydnor, Marda)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/19/2019. (KAM)
February 15, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. *See Doc #1 , page 14* (KEK)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East LP from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2018-904575, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid et al v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Reid
Represented By: J Callen Sparrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Reid
Represented By: J Callen Sparrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Represented By: Marda W Sydnor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?