Ellis et al v. Bank of America NA et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Ellis and Steven C Ellis
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Ditech Financial LLC, Bank of America NA and Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv00310
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Referring Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gerhardt, Graham)
April 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Ditech Financial LLC of Bankruptcy Filing and Imposition of Automatic Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gerhardt, Graham)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER This case is before the court on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. #5 , #6 , #7 . Because Plaintiffs have since filed an Amended Complaint #16 , Defendants' Motions #5 , #6 , #7 are no longer directed at the operative pleading. Thus, the Motions #5 , #6 , #7 are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as MOOT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/9/2019. (KAM)
April 8, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Steven C Ellis, Michelle Ellis.(Lay, Kenneth)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER-This case is before the court on Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Amended Complaint. #14 . The Motion #14 is GRANTED. On or before April 8, 2019, Plaintiffs SHALL file their amended complaint on the court docket. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/5/2019. (KAM)
April 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend complaint by Michelle Ellis, Steven C Ellis. (Lay, Kenneth)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER This case is before the court on Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend. #12 . The Motion #12 is GRANTED. On or before April 4, 2019, Plaintiff SHALL file an amended complaint on the court docket. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/22/2019. (KAM)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint by Michelle Ellis, Steven C Ellis. (Lay, Kenneth)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum in Support, #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum in Support, #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Michelle Ellis, Steven C Ellis. (Lay, Kenneth)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/7/2019. (KAM)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE- The telephone status conference set for March 21, 2019 is CANCELLED (MRR, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 2:19-310-RDP on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum in Support by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Gerhardt, Graham)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum in Support by Bank of America NA, Ditech Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Gerhardt, Graham)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum in Support by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Gerhardt, Graham)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing and Imposition of Automatic Stay by Ditech Financial LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gerhardt, Graham) Modified text on 3/1/2019 (MRR, ).
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than April 7, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after April 7, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 am on March 21, 2019, in chambers. The status conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 2/22/19. (MRR, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Circuit Court of Shelby County, case number 58-cv-2019-900042., filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MRR, )
February 21, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3283873 (B4601095545). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Circuit Court of Shelby County, case number 58-cv-2019-900042., filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(MRR, ). (Gerhardt, Graham) Modified on 2/21/2019 (MRR, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis et al v. Bank of America NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Ellis
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven C Ellis
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Represented By: Graham W Gerhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Graham W Gerhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Graham W Gerhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Graham W Gerhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?