ITASCA IMAGES LLC v. Capstone Realty LLC et al
Plaintiff: ITASCA IMAGES LLC
Defendant: Zillow Inc, Trulia LLC, Huntsville Area Associationof Realtors Inc, Re/Max LLC, Move Inc, Ben Porter Real Estate of Huntsville Inc, Steve Stinson, Keller Williams Realty, Inc., Move Inc d/b/a Realtor.com a Delaware corporation and Huntsville Area Associationof Realtors Inc d/b/a North Alabama Multiple Listing Service an Alabama non-profit corporation
Cross Defendant: Capstone Realty LLC
Cross Claimant: VALLEYMLS.COM, INC. f/k/a NORTH ALABAMA MULTIPLE LISTING SERVICE, INC. & d/b/a HUNTSVILLE AREA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS
Case Number: 2:2019cv00336
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Upon consideration of the Parties' Stipulation of Entry of Permanent Injunction and Dismissal with Prejudice #68 , it is hereby ordered that a permanent injunction is entered against Defendants. Further, upon consideration of the Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice #69 , this case is now dismissed with prejudice. Costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 10/23/2019. (PSM)
October 22, 2019 Filing 69 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by ITASCA IMAGES LLC. filed by ITASCA IMAGES LLC (Flaherty, Scott)
October 22, 2019 Filing 68 STIPULATION of Entry of Permanent Injunction and Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by ITASCA IMAGES LLC. filed by ITASCA IMAGES LLC (Flaherty, Scott)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 TEXT ORDER granting #66 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's deadline to add new causes of action and parties is extended by thirty (30) days. Defendants' deadline to add new defenses or claims and parties is also extended by thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 7/15/2019. (TLM2)
July 12, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION for Extension of Time by VALLEYMLS.COM, INC. f/k/a NORTH ALABAMA MULTIPLE LISTING SERVICE, INC. & d/b/a HUNTSVILLE AREA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS. (Rawlinson, Robert)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/1/2020. Joint Status Report due by 3/15/2020. Jury Trial set for 10/13/2020 at 9:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 6/21/2019. (PSM)
June 20, 2019 Filing 64 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Flaherty, Scott)
June 7, 2019 Filing 63 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by Keller Williams Realty, Inc., Steve Stinson.(Owens, Richard)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying #61 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties should hold their parties' planning meeting within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Additionally, the parties should provide notice to the Third-Party Defendants of the scheduled date and time for their parties' planning meeting. The parties' Rule 26(f) report is due within twenty (20) days from the date of this Order, even if the report does not include input from the Third-Party Defendants. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 5/31/2019. (PSM)
May 23, 2019 Filing 61 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Rule 26(f) Conference and Report Filing by ITASCA IMAGES LLC. (Franz, Morgan)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER This Court acknowledges receipt of Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Re/Max, LLC. #59 filed on May 14, 2019. Accordingly, Defendant Re/Max, LLC is DISMISSED from this action. Plaintiff's claims against all other Defendants remain pending. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 5/15/2019. (PSM)
May 14, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ITASCA IMAGES LLC (Flaherty, Scott)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER This Court acknowledges receipt of Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Trulia, LLC #57 filed on May 13, 2019. Accordingly, Defendant Trulia, LLC is DISMISSED from this action. Plaintiffs claims against all other Defendants remain pending. Because Defendant Trulia, LLC has been voluntarily dismissed from this action, its Motion to Dismiss #53 is TERMINATED as MOOT. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 5/14/2019. (PSM)
May 13, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ITASCA IMAGES LLC (Flaherty, Scott)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER This Court acknowledges receipt of Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Zillow, Inc. #55 filed on May 09, 2019. Accordingly, Defendant Zillow, Inc. is DISMISSED from this action. Plaintiff's claims against all other Defendants remain pending. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 5/10/2019. (PSM)
May 9, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ITASCA IMAGES LLC (Flaherty, Scott)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Before this Court is Defendant Trulia, LLC's Motion to Dismiss. #53 Plaintiff has ten (10) days from the date of this Order to respond to the Motion. Defendant Trulia, LLC will thereafter have seven (7) days to file a reply. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 5/8/2019. (PSM)
May 7, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss by Trulia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1)(Chatterton, Marcus)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TEXT ORDER granting #48 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 5/02/2019. (TLM2)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT ORDER granting #47 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 5/02/2019. (TLM2)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 TEXT ORDER granting #41 Motion for Limited Admission. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 5/02/2019. (TLM2)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TEXT ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 5/02/2019. (TLM2)
April 29, 2019 PHV Fee paid: by Robert E Rawlinson in the amount of $50.00, receipt number B4601097127. (KWC)
April 29, 2019 PHV Fee paid:by Robert E Rawlinson in the amount of $50.00, receipt number B4601097128. (KWC)
April 29, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Atty Mitchell A Skinner by Huntsville Area Associationof Realtors Inc, VALLEYMLS.COM, INC. f/k/a NORTH ALABAMA MULTIPLE LISTING SERVICE, INC. & d/b/a HUNTSVILLE AREA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Rawlinson, Robert) Modified on 4/29/2019 (KWC)
April 29, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for atty Jade E. Holman by Huntsville Area Association of Realtors Inc, VALLEYMLS.COM, INC. f/k/a NORTH ALABAMA MULTIPLE LISTING SERVICE, INC. & d/b/a HUNTSVILLE AREA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Rawlinson, Robert) Modified on 4/29/2019 (KWC)
April 26, 2019 Filing 46 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Ben Porter Real Estate of Huntsville Inc.(Holt, David)
April 26, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Holt on behalf of Ben Porter Real Estate of Huntsville Inc (Holt, Angela)
April 25, 2019 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capstone Realty LLC. Keller Williams Realty, Inc. served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Holt, David)
April 25, 2019 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capstone Realty LLC. Steve Stinson served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Holt, David)
April 25, 2019 Filing 42 ANSWER to Crossclaim by Capstone Realty LLC.(Holt, David)
April 25, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Limited Admission Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Trulia LLC, Zillow Inc. (Chatterton, Marcus)
April 25, 2019 PHV Fee paid for Michael G. Atkins in the amount of $50.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3331550, NDAL receipt #B4601097054. (Chatterton, Marcus) Modified on 4/25/2019 (JLC).
April 23, 2019 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Amended Complaint, by Trulia LLC, Zillow Inc. (Chatterton, Marcus)
April 23, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Vance Baxley on behalf of Trulia LLC, Zillow Inc (Baxley, Robert)
April 23, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus R Chatterton on behalf of Trulia LLC, Zillow Inc (Chatterton, Marcus)
April 23, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Will Hill Tankersley on behalf of Trulia LLC, Zillow Inc (Tankersley, Will)
April 22, 2019 Filing 36 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Keller Williams Realty, Inc., Steve Stinson, filed by Capstone Realty LLC.(Holt, David)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER This Court acknowledges receipt of Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Move, Inc. #32 filed on April 16, 2019. Accordingly, Defendant Move, Inc. is DISMISSED from this action. Plaintiff's claims against all other Defendants remain pending. Because Defendant Move, Inc. has been dismissed from this action, its Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #31 is TERMINATED as MOOT. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/19/2019. (PSM)
April 18, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Capstone Realty LLC.(Holt, David)
April 17, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by G Bartley Loftin, III on behalf of Capstone Realty LLC (Loftin, G)
April 16, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ITASCA IMAGES LLC (Flaherty, Scott)
April 16, 2019 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Amended Complaint by Move Inc. (Baker, Joshua)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 4/15/2019. (TLM2)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 4/15/2019. (TLM2)
April 15, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed (certified mail) as to Zillow Inc, served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (KWC)
April 12, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Amended Complaint by Ben Porter Real Estate of Huntsville Inc. (Holt, David)
April 12, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Amended Complaint by Capstone Realty LLC. (Holt, David)
April 11, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Capstone Realty LLC by VALLEYMLS.COM, INC. f/k/a NORTH ALABAMA MULTIPLE LISTING SERVICE, INC. & d/b/a HUNTSVILLE AREA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS.(Rawlinson, Robert)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 4/4/2019. (TLM2)
April 3, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Amend Complaint by Move Inc. (Baker, Joshua)
April 3, 2019 Filing 22 Summons Returned executed by ITASCA IMAGES LLC as to Trulia LLC. (TLM, ) Modified on 4/3/2019 (TLM, ).
April 2, 2019 Filing 21 Alias Summons Issued as to Zillow Inc. mailed certifed mail (TLM, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Returned executed by ITASCA IMAGES LLC as to Zillow Inc. (TLM, ) Modified on 4/3/2019 (TLM, ).
April 1, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ITASCA IMAGES LLC. Move Inc served on 3/25/2019, (TLM, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ITASCA IMAGES LLC. Ben Porter Real Estate of Huntsville Inc served on 3/25/2018, answer due 4/15/2018; Capstone Realty LLC served on 3/25/2018, answer due 4/15/2018. (TLM, ) (TLM, ).
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 3/22/2019. (TLM2)
March 21, 2019 Filing 17 Summons & Amended Complaint Issued as to Ben Porter Real Estate of Huntsville Inc, Capstone Realty LLC, Move Inc, Re/Max LLC, Trulia LLC, Zillow Inc.mailed certified mail (TLM, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 15 Request for service by certified mail filed by ITASCA IMAGES LLC. (Franz, Morgan)
March 20, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ben Porter Real Estate of Huntsville Inc, Capstone Realty LLC, Move Inc, Re/Max LLC, Trulia LLC, Zillow Inc, VALLEYMLS.COM, INC. f/k/a NORTH ALABAMA MULTIPLE LISTING SERVICE, INC. & d/b/a HUNTSVILLE AREA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS, filed by ITASCA IMAGES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Franz, Morgan)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 3/20/2019. (PSM)
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Move Inc. (Baker, Joshua)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed (certified mail). Zillow Inc served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (KWC)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ITASCA IMAGES LLC. Move Inc served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (KAM)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Re/Max LLC served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Trulia LLC served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (KWC)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 3/05/2019. (TLM2)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ITASCA IMAGES LLC. Capstone Realty LLC served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (TLM, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ITASCA IMAGES LLC. Ben Porter Real Estate of Huntsville Inc served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Huntsville Area Associationof Realtors Inc served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (TLM, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ITASCA IMAGES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Franz, Morgan)
February 28, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number B4601095732 (Franz, Morgan) Modified on 3/1/2019 (TLM, ).
February 28, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601095673 (TLM, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Capstone Realty LLC, Huntsville Area Associationof Realtors Inc, Move Inc, Re/Max LLC, Trulia LLC, Zillow Inc. mailed certified mail (TLM, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Evidentiary Material re: #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Franz, Morgan)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by ITASCA IMAGES LLC. (TLM, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ben Porter Real Estate of Huntsville Inc, Capstone Realty LLC, Huntsville Area Associationof Realtors Inc, Move Inc, Re/Max LLC, Trulia LLC, Zillow Inc, filed by ITASCA IMAGES LLC.(TLM, )
February 26, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3287368. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Ben Porter Real Estate of Huntsville Inc, Capstone Realty LLC, Huntsville Area Associationof Realtors Inc, Move Inc, Re/Max LLC, Trulia LLC, Zillow Inc, filed by ITASCA IMAGES LLC.(TLM, ). (Franz, Morgan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ITASCA IMAGES LLC v. Capstone Realty LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zillow Inc
Represented By: Robert Vance Baxley
Represented By: Marcus R Chatterton
Represented By: Will Hill Tankersley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trulia LLC
Represented By: Robert Vance Baxley
Represented By: Marcus R Chatterton
Represented By: Will Hill Tankersley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsville Area Associationof Realtors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Re/Max LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Move Inc
Represented By: Joshua B Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Porter Real Estate of Huntsville Inc
Represented By: Angela Holt
Represented By: David W Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Stinson
Represented By: Richard R Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keller Williams Realty, Inc.
Represented By: Richard R Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Move Inc d/b/a Realtor.com a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Joshua B Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsville Area Associationof Realtors Inc d/b/a North Alabama Multiple Listing Service an Alabama non-profit corporation
Represented By: Jade E. Holman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Skinner
Represented By: Robert E Rawlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ITASCA IMAGES LLC
Represented By: Morgan Brooke Franz
Represented By: Scott Michael Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Capstone Realty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: VALLEYMLS.COM, INC. f/k/a NORTH ALABAMA MULTIPLE LISTING SERVICE, INC. & d/b/a HUNTSVILLE AREA ASSOCIATION OF REALTORS
Represented By: Robert E Rawlinson
Represented By: Jade E. Holman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?