Jones v. North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC
Plaintiff: Alice Jones
Defendant: North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00396
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Compel Arbitration by North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Arbitration Agreement)(Sproule, R)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 4/24/2019. (KEK)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/10/2020. Dispositive motions due by 2/17/2020. Status Conference set for Monday, 1/13/2020 at 11:00 AM, CR 7B, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL. See Order for other deadlines and directives. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 4/5/2019. (YMB)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sproule, R)
March 6, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3294070 (ALND B4601095887) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2018-904541, filed by North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibti C)(KEK). (Sproule, R) Modified on 3/6/2019 (KEK).
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC. filed by North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC (Sproule, R)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC.(Sproule, R)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2018-904541, filed by North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibti C)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Jones
Represented By: F. Page Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Hill Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Reid Egbe
Represented By: Mary Alexandra Parish
Represented By: R Gordon Sproule, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?