Lucas v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: LaSonya Lucas
Defendant: Mariana Palacios, United States of America, Theresa Abernathy and Kirk P. Withrow
Case Number: 2:2019cv00426
Filed: March 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:18-cv-00873. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 12, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION to transfer Venue, as further set out in order; directing the clerk to effect the transfer to the US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/12/19. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY BRIEF re #14 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Theresa Abernathy, Mariana Palacios, United States of America, Kirk P. Withrow. (DuBois, James) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER directing as follows: (1) GRANTING #21 MOTION to LIFT STAY; (2) the STAY is LIFTED; and (3) Defs may, but are not required to, file a reply brief to Pl's opposition to their motion to transfer on or before 3/11/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/4/19. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to LIFT STAY by United States of America. (DuBois, James) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #18 MOTION to Stay to the extent it requests a stay of proceedings, and this matter is STAYED; all pending deadlines are continued generally until further order of the court; further ORDERING that the USA is directed to file a motion to lift the stay when its normal operations have resumed. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/9/19. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Change Venue filed by LaSonya Lucas. (Morgan, Fernando) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay OF ALL DEADLINES IN LIGHT OF LAPSE OF APPROPRIATIONS by Theresa Abernathy, Mariana Palacios, United States of America, Kirk P. Withrow. (DuBois, James) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 17 Case reassigned to Chief Judge William Keith Watkins and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker. Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing the plf file a response to the #14 motion for transfer on or before 1/4/2019; defs may file a Reply on or before 1/11/2019; directing counsel for the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the clerk on or before 12/21/2018, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/17/18. (djy, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Theresa Abernathy, Mariana Palacios, United States of America, Kirk P. Withrow. (DuBois, James) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer to the Northern District of Alabama by Theresa Abernathy, Mariana Palacios, United States of America, Kirk P. Withrow. (DuBois, James). Corrected to event for MOTION to Change Venue on 12/18/2018 (qc/djy, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Rachel Lockhart on 10/26/2018 for Dr. Mariana Y. Palacios. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by (illegible) on (no date given) for Robert Wilkie, Sec of Veterans Affairs. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
October 31, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re #10 Return Receipt Card, #9 Return Receipt Card. The referenced docket entries were modified to reflect the answer due date for 60 days, set for 12/17/2018. (dmn, ) (NO PDF) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Reset Answer Deadlines for Federal Defendants Theresa Abernathy and Kirk P. Withrow to 12/17/2018; original dates were erroneously not set for 60 days. (dmn, )(NO PDF) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Emily Sase for Attorney General of the United States served 10/23/2018.(dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Hazel Perkins for Dr. Kirk P. Withrow served on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (dmn, ) Modified on 10/31/2018 to correct answer deadline to 60 days. (dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Hazel Perkins for Dr. Theresa Abernathy served on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (dmn, ) Modified on 10/31/2018 to correct answer deadline to 60 days. (dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Lawrence B (name illegible) for U. S. Attorney's Office served on 10/18/2018, United States of America answer due 12/17/2018. (dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Honorable Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veteran Affairs. (dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Theresa Abernathy, Mariana Palacios, United States of America, Kirk P. Withrow, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Correction re #1 Complaint. This notice is docketed to include the pdf of the additional attachment, Civil Filing Fee, which was erroneously omitted at the time of filing of the referenced document. The pdf of the attachment, Civil Filing Fee is attached to this notice. (Attachments: #1 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff LaSonya Lucas. (dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Correction re #1 Complaint. The original pdf did not contain the jury demand notation on the first page. The correct pdf is attached to this notice. (Attachments: #1 Correct pdf of Complaint)(dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by LaSonya Lucas. (dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
October 10, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LaSonya Lucas. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #1 for pdf.) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Theresa Abernathy, Mariana Palacios, United States of America, Kirk P. Withrow ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050989.), filed by LaSonya Lucas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/16/2018 to include jury demand notation on first page.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2018, omitted erroneously at original time of filing: #2 Filing Fee Receipt) (dmn, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 3/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaSonya Lucas
Represented By: Fernando Antonio Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariana Palacios
Represented By: James J DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: James J DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Abernathy
Represented By: James J DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk P. Withrow
Represented By: James J DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?